JONES v. CITY PLAZA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL B JONES and MICHAEL B. JONES
Defendant: CITY PLAZA, LLC, T.E. JOHNSON & SONS, INC. and ONLINE INFORMATION SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00924
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: N C TILLEY
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CAREN D. ENLOE on behalf of Defendant ONLINE INFORMATION SERVICES, INC. (ENLOE, CAREN)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by ONLINE INFORMATION SERVICES, INC. Answer due by 12/5/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 11/4/2019. (Brubaker, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by ONLINE INFORMATION SERVICES, INC.. (ENLOE, CAREN)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL B. JONES as to ONLINE INFORMATION SERVICES, INC. served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. on Manager Michael Miscnee (MILLER, JONATHAN)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for T.E. JOHNSON & SONS, INC. Answer due by 11/20/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/18/2019. (Brubaker, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead or Respond by T.E. JOHNSON & SONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WAIT, JOHN)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for CITY PLAZA, LLC. Answer due by 11/20/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/11/20219. (Brubaker, John)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer To Plaintiff's Complaint by CITY PLAZA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DECKER, RACHEL)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL B. JONES as to T.E. JOHNSON & SONS, INC. served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. on Officer (President) Phillip Johnson (MILLER, JONATHAN)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL B. JONES as to CITY PLAZA, LLC served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. on Registered Agent Brian Byrd (MILLER, JONATHAN)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Cosnent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CITY PLAZA, LLC, ONLINE INFORMATION SERVICES, INC., T.E. JOHNSON & SONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Online, #2 City Plaza)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 10, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY PLAZA, LLC, ONLINE INFORMATION SERVICES, INC., T.E. JOHNSON & SONS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2650150.), filed by MICHAEL B JONES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Web page - ONLINE Information home, #2 Exhibit B - Web page - ONLINE Rental Exchnage, #3 Exhibit C - T.E. Johnson collection letter, #4 Exhibit D - Email from T.E. Johnson employee, #5 Exhibit E - T.E. Johnson's response to BBB complaint, #6 Exhibit F - T.E. Johnson's response to NC Real Estate Commission response, #7 Exhibit G - Web page - ONLINE Information, "Consumers," first version, #8 Exhibit H - Web page - ONLINE Information, "Consumers," second version, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(MILLER, JONATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. CITY PLAZA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY PLAZA, LLC
Represented By: RACHEL SCOTT DECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.E. JOHNSON & SONS, INC.
Represented By: JOHN L. WAIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONLINE INFORMATION SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: CAREN D. ENLOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL B JONES
Represented By: JONATHAN R. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL B. JONES
Represented By: JONATHAN R. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?