UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CURRENCY IN $7,400.00 IN U.S. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: CURRENCY IN $7,400.00 IN U.S. and 2016 FORD F-150, VIN 1FTEW1EP4GFB92711
Case Number: 1:2019cv00934
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 USMS Return Executed for Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice served on 2016 Ford F-150, VIN 1FTEW1EP4GFB92711 on October 16, 2019, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (STRUP, NATHAN)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 USMS Return Executed for Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice served on $7,400.00 in U.S. Currency on October 16, 2019, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (STRUP, NATHAN)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 SERVICE by Publication filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Served by publication in an official government internet site (www.forfeiture.gov) as to Legal Notice on date(s) September 25, 2019 through October 24, 2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT FOR WARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 9/16/2019 and delivered to USA for service. (Daniel, J)
September 13, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Judge MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: #2 Application for Warrant for Arrest. (Garland, Leah)
September 12, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garland, Leah)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Warrant for Arrest (), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(STRUP, NATHAN)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against 2016 FORD F-150, VIN 1FTEW1EP4GFB92711, CURRENCY IN $7,400.00 IN U.S. (Filing fee.), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(STRUP, NATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CURRENCY IN $7,400.00 IN U.S. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURRENCY IN $7,400.00 IN U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2016 FORD F-150, VIN 1FTEW1EP4GFB92711
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: NATHAN L. STRUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?