PORT CITY NEUROSURGERY & SPINE, P.C. v. BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NORTH CAROLINA
Plaintiff: Port City Neurosurgery & Spine, P.C.
Defendant: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NORTH CAROLINA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00948
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by PORT CITY NEUROSURGERY & SPINE, P.C. filed by BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NORTH CAROLINA. Replies due by 11/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(HANSEN, CHAD)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NORTH CAROLINA filed by PORT CITY NEUROSURGERY & SPINE, P.C.. Replies due by 11/18/2019 (MARTIN, ELLIS)
October 25, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TERRILL JOHNSON HARRIS on behalf of Plaintiff PORT CITY NEUROSURGERY & SPINE, P.C. (HARRIS, TERRILL)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF re #9 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff PORT CITY NEUROSURGERY & SPINE, P.C. filed by PORT CITY NEUROSURGERY & SPINE, P.C.. (MARTIN, ELLIS)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by PORT CITY NEUROSURGERY & SPINE, P.C.. Response to Motion due by 11/6/2019 (MARTIN, ELLIS)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NORTH CAROLINA re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NORTH CAROLINA. (HANSEN, CHAD)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NORTH CAROLINA. Response to Motion due by 11/4/2019 (HANSEN, CHAD)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 11/21/2019 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PHILLIP A. HARRIS, JR on behalf of Defendant BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NORTH CAROLINA (HARRIS, PHILLIP)
September 17, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 17, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NORTH CAROLINA. (Original document filed in Orange County Superior Court, 19CV420 and is listed as Exhibit 11 to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NORTH CAROLINA, filed by PORT CITY NEUROSURGERY & SPINE, P.C. (Original document filed in New Hanover Superior Court, case number 19CVS420 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NORTH CAROLINA. (HANSEN, CHAD)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against Port City Neurosurgery & Spine, P.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2655448.), filed by BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NORTH CAROLINA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Motion for Extension, #3 Exhibit State Court Order Granting Extension, #4 Exhibit State Court Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit State Court Notice of Hearing, #6 Exhibit State Court Designation of Secured Leave Period, #7 Exhibit State Court Notice of Appearance, #8 Exhibit State Court Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss, #9 Exhibit State Court Consent Order, #10 Exhibit State Court Court Order for Mediated Settlement Conf., #11 Exhibit State Court Answer, #12 Exhibit State Court Case Management Schedule, #13 Exhibit State Court Designation of Mediator, #14 Exhibit State Court Motion for Extension, #15 Exhibit State Court Order Granting Extension, #16 Exhibit State Court Consent Protective Order, #17 Exhibit Notice of Substitution of Counsel, #18 Affidavit Declaration of Mark E. Werner, #19 Exhibit Werner Declaration Exh. 1- Network Provider Agreement, #20 Affidavit Declaration of Joaquin Davis, #21 Exhibit Davis Declaration Exh. 1- List of Patients, #22 Exhibit Davis Declaration Exh. 2-Benefit Plan Booklet, #23 Exhibit Davis Declaration Exh. 3-Benefit Plan Booklet, #24 Exhibit Davis Declaration Exh. 4-Benefit Plan Booklet, #25 Exhibit Davis Declaration Exh. 5-Claim Form)(HANSEN, CHAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PORT CITY NEUROSURGERY & SPINE, P.C. v. BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Port City Neurosurgery & Spine, P.C.
Represented By: TERRILL JOHNSON HARRIS
Represented By: ELLIS W. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: CHAD DWIGHT HANSEN
Represented By: PHILLIP A. HARRIS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?