ZOU et al v. MARKET AMERICA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: OLLIE LAN, JINHUA ZOU, CHUANJIE YANG, LIU LIU and YU XIA LU
Defendant: DOLLY KUO, MARKET AMERICA WORLDWIDE INC., LIU LUCY HONG, MARTY WEISSMAN, ANTHONY AKERS, EDDY ALBERTY, VINCENT CHANG, SAM RITCHIE, ACE LEE, YANG ZHAO, BILL WU, MARKET AMERICA, INC., MIN LIU, MAGGIE HO, SARAH LOLO, FRANK KEEFER, CHEN JI XIAOYING, LOREN RIDINGER, ALICE CHIOU, EUGENE WALLACE, STEVE ASHLEY, JOE BOLYARD, DENNIS FRANKS, SIMON LIU, PETER GOLD, STEPHANIE LEE, SHOP MA, INC., JOANNE HSI, MICHAEL BRADY, KITTY CHAO, JUNE YU SHAN, ELIZABETH WEBER, CHRIS PEDDYCORD, JIM WINKLER, WANG CHANG, ROGER WU, MING-CHU KUO, ALICE HSIEH, VICTOR CHIOU, MARC ASHLEY, BENJAMIN GINDER, PATRICK HSIEH, VINCENT HUNT, KEVIN BUCKMAN, JAMES HOWARD RIDINGER, BRANDI QINN and KARRI WU
Case Number: 1:2019cv00954
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Case reassigned to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR, MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE no longer assigned to the case. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 17, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 17, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 17, 2019 Filing 36 ECF 30 Day Notice as to Blake Lindemann, Darren Schlecter, Lawrence Steinberg. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 10/17/2019. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 17, 2019 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-01282. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting Motion to Transfer to the Middle District of North Carolina and Denying Motion to Dismiss or Stay as Moot.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Anthony Akers, Eddy Alberty, Marc Ashley, Steve Ashley, Joe Bolyard, Michael Brady, Kevin Buckman, Dennis Franks, Peter Gold, Vincent Hunt, James Howard Ridinger, Market America Worldwide, Inc., Market America, Inc., Chris Peddycord, Brandi Qinn, Loren Ridinger, Sam Ritchie, Shop MA, Inc., Eugene Wallace, Marty Weissman, Jim Winkler. Motion Hearing set for 1/2/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/25/2019. Replies due by 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and Exhibits A thru H, #2 Declaration Declaration of Pressly Millen in Support of Defendants' Motion for Sanctions, #3 Proposed Order PROPOSED Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Sanctions)(Steinberg, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by Jinhua Zou re #20 Opposition/Response to Motion, of Recent Decision pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-3(d)(2) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Blake J. Lindemann, #2 Exhibit 1-4, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lindemann, Blake) (Filed on 9/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 31 **CLERK'S NOTICE** VACATING September 12, 2019 Hearing on #11 MOTION to Dismiss. Matter to be determined on the papers without oral argument. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Reset Hearing pursuant to #30 ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference CONTINUED from July 3, 2019 to October 23, 2019 at 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Continuing Case Management Conference.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 9 Clerk's Notice,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Anthony Akers, Eddy Alberty, Marc Ashley, Steve Ashley, Joe Bolyard, Michael Brady, Kevin Buckman, Dennis Franks, Peter Gold, Vincent Hunt, James Howard Ridinger, Market America Worldwide, Inc., Market America, Inc., Chris Peddycord, Brandi Qinn, Loren Ridinger, Sam Ritchie, Shop MA, Inc., Eugene Wallace, Marty Weissman, Jim Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Stipulation Continuing Initial Case Management Conference)(Steinberg, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/25/2019) Modified on 6/25/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lindemann, Blake) (Filed on 6/19/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Steinberg, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/19/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 26 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 25 Proposed Order re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the Middle District of North Carolina, or in the Alternative, to Stay Action Pending Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Anthony Akers, Eddy Alberty, Marc Ashley, Steve Ashley, Joe Bolyard, Michael Brady, Kevin Buckman, Dennis Franks, Peter Gold, Vincent Hunt, James Howard Ridinger, Market America Worldwide, Inc., Market America, Inc., Chris Peddycord, Brandi Qinn, Loren Ridinger, Sam Ritchie, Shop MA, Inc., Eugene Wallace, Marty Weissman, Jim Winkler. (Steinberg, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the Middle District of North Carolina, or in the Alternative, to Stay Action Pending Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byAnthony Akers, Eddy Alberty, Marc Ashley, Steve Ashley, Joe Bolyard, Michael Brady, Kevin Buckman, Dennis Franks, Peter Gold, Vincent Hunt, James Howard Ridinger, Market America Worldwide, Inc., Market America, Inc., Chris Peddycord, Brandi Qinn, Loren Ridinger, Sam Ritchie, Shop MA, Inc., Eugene Wallace, Marty Weissman, Jim Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Second Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, or Transfer, or Stay Action Pending Arbitration)(Steinberg, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/10/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #22 Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the Middle District of North Carolina, or in the Alternative, to Stay Action Pending Arbitration. Reply deadline extended to June 11, 2019. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 12 Clerk's Notice,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, #11 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the Middle District of North Carolina, or in the Alternative, to Stay Action Pending Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Deadline to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, Or In The Alternative, To Transfer To The Middle District of North Carolina, Or In The Alternative, To Stay Action Pending Arbitration filed by Anthony Akers, Eddy Alberty, Marc Ashley, Steve Ashley, Joe Bolyard, Michael Brady, Kevin Buckman, Dennis Franks, Peter Gold, Vincent Hunt, James Howard Ridinger, Market America Worldwide, Inc., Market America, Inc., Chris Peddycord, Brandi Qinn, Loren Ridinger, Sam Ritchie, Shop MA, Inc., Eugene Wallace, Marty Weissman, Jim Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support)(Steinberg, Lawrence) (Filed on 5/23/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Jinhua Zou in Opposition to #19 Errata, #17 Declaration in Opposition, #20 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Signature Page) filed byJinhua Zou. (Related document(s) #19 , #17 , #20 ) (Lindemann, Blake) (Filed on 5/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the Middle District of North Carolina, or in the Alternative, to Stay Action Pending Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) Amended To Include Table of Contents and Table of Authorities filed byJinhua Zou. (Lindemann, Blake) (Filed on 5/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 19 ERRATA re #15 Opposition/Response to Motion, #17 Declaration in Opposition Notice of Errata and Filing of Amended Opposition by Jinhua Zou. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lindemann, Blake) (Filed on 5/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Robert L. Fitzpatrick in Opposition to #15 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byJinhua Zou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3, #4 Exhibit Part 4)(Related document(s) #15 ) (Lindemann, Blake) (Filed on 5/20/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Jinhua Zou in Opposition to #15 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byJinhua Zou. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Lindemann, Blake) (Filed on 5/20/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Blake J. Lindemann in Opposition to #15 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byJinhua Zou. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Lindemann, Blake) (Filed on 5/20/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the Middle District of North Carolina, or in the Alternative, to Stay Action Pending Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byJinhua Zou. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lindemann, Blake) (Filed on 5/20/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13329182.) filed by Anthony Akers, Eddy Alberty, Marc Ashley, Steve Ashley, Joe Bolyard, Michael Brady, Kevin Buckman, Dennis Franks, Peter Gold, Vincent Hunt, James Howard Ridinger, Market America Worldwide, Inc., Market America, Inc., Chris Peddycord, Brandi Qinn, Loren Ridinger, Sam Ritchie, Shop MA, Inc., Eugene Wallace, Marty Weissman, Jim Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Attachment A to Application, #2 Exhibit B-Certificate of Good Standing)(Millen, Pressly) (Filed on 5/8/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 **CLERK'S NOTICE** Hearing for #11 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the Middle District of North Carolina, or in the Alternative, to Stay Action Pending Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities is CONTINUED from June 13, 2019 to September 12, 2019 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, California, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before the Honorable Lucy H. Koh. The June 13, 2019 hearing date was not cleared with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the Middle District of North Carolina, or in the Alternative, to Stay Action Pending Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Anthony Akers, Eddy Alberty, Marc Ashley, Steve Ashley, Joe Bolyard, Michael Brady, Kevin Buckman, Dennis Franks, Peter Gold, Vincent Hunt, James Howard Ridinger, Market America Worldwide, Inc., Market America, Inc., Chris Peddycord, Brandi Qinn, Loren Ridinger, Sam Ritchie, Shop MA, Inc., Eugene Wallace, Marty Weissman, Jim Winkler. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 5/20/2019. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pressly M. Millen In Support, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support)(Steinberg, Lawrence) (Filed on 5/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR CERTAIN DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT [Civil L.R. 6-1(a)] filed by Anthony Akers, Eddy Alberty, Marc Ashley, Steve Ashley, Joe Bolyard, Michael Brady, Kevin Buckman, Dennis Franks, Peter Gold, Vincent Hunt, James Howard Ridinger, Market America Worldwide, Inc., Market America, Inc., Chris Peddycord, Brandi Qinn, Loren Ridinger, Sam Ritchie, Shop MA, Inc., Eugene Wallace, Marty Weissman, Jim Winkler. (Steinberg, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for Wednesday, July 3, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jinhua Zou.. (Lindemann, Blake) (Filed on 3/22/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Anthony Akers, Eddy Alberty, Marc Ashley, Steve Ashley, Joe Bolyard, Michael Brady, Kevin Buckman, Vincent Chang, Wang Chang, Kitty Chao, Alice Chiou, Victor Chiou, Dennis Franks, Benjamin Ginder, Peter Gold, Maggie Ho, Joanne Hsi, Alice Hsieh, Patrick Hsieh, Vincent Hunt, James Howard Ridinger, Frank Keefer, Dolly Kuo, Ming-Chu Kuo, Ace Lee, Stephanie Lee, Min Liu, Simon Liu, Sarah Lolo, Liu Lucy Hong, Market America Worldwide, Inc., Market America, Inc., Chris Peddycord, Brandi Qinn, Loren Ridinger, Sam Ritchie, June Yu Shan, Shop MA, Inc., Eugene Wallace, Elizabeth Weber, Marty Weissman, Jim Winkler, Bill Wu, Karri Wu, Roger Wu, Chen Ji Xiaoying, Yang Zhao. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)[Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/25/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Lindemann, Blake) (Filed on 3/8/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13157751.). Filed byJinhua Zou. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lindemann, Blake) (Filed on 3/8/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZOU et al v. MARKET AMERICA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOLLY KUO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARKET AMERICA WORLDWIDE INC.
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIU LUCY HONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTY WEISSMAN
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY AKERS
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDDY ALBERTY
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCENT CHANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAM RITCHIE
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YANG ZHAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL WU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARKET AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIN LIU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAGGIE HO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH LOLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK KEEFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEN JI XIAOYING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOREN RIDINGER
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALICE CHIOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUGENE WALLACE
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE ASHLEY
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE BOLYARD
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS FRANKS
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMON LIU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER GOLD
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHANIE LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHOP MA, INC.
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOANNE HSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BRADY
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KITTY CHAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUNE YU SHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH WEBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS PEDDYCORD
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIM WINKLER
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WANG CHANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER WU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MING-CHU KUO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALICE HSIEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTOR CHIOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARC ASHLEY
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN GINDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK HSIEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCENT HUNT
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN BUCKMAN
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES HOWARD RIDINGER
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDI QINN
Represented By: Lawrence Bruce Steinberg
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARRI WU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLLIE LAN
Represented By: Blake Joseph Lindemann
Represented By: DAREN M SCHLECTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JINHUA ZOU
Represented By: Blake Joseph Lindemann
Represented By: DAREN M SCHLECTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHUANJIE YANG
Represented By: Blake Joseph Lindemann
Represented By: DAREN M SCHLECTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIU LIU
Represented By: Blake Joseph Lindemann
Represented By: DAREN M SCHLECTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YU XIA LU
Represented By: Blake Joseph Lindemann
Represented By: DAREN M SCHLECTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?