ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY v. CASEY'S AUTO SERVICE, INC., et al
Plaintiff: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: Casey's Auto Service, Inc. and Asset Recovery Solutions of N.C., LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00957
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , Counterclaim against by ASSET RECOVERY SOLUTIONS OF N.C., LLC, CASEY'S AUTO SERVICE, INC.. (MARSHALL, ANTOINE)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for ASSET RECOVERY SOLUTIONS OF N.C., LLC and CASEY'S AUTO SERVICE, INC. Answer due by 11/14/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/17/2019. (Brubaker, John)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ASSET RECOVERY SOLUTIONS OF N.C., LLC, CASEY'S AUTO SERVICE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARSHALL, ANTOINE)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 ***FILED IN ERROR***First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ASSET RECOVERY SOLUTIONS OF N.C., LLC, CASEY'S AUTO SERVICE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARSHALL, ANTOINE) Modified on 10/15/2019 to mark as Filed in Error and to remove document from view. Attorney instructed to properly re-file. (Garland, Leah)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANTOINE G. MARSHALL on behalf of Defendants ASSET RECOVERY SOLUTIONS OF N.C., LLC, CASEY'S AUTO SERVICE, INC. (MARSHALL, ANTOINE)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to CASEY'S AUTO SERVICE, INC. served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BROWN, DAVID)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ASSET RECOVERY SOLUTIONS OF N.C., LLC, CASEY'S AUTO SERVICE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Casey's Auto)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 19, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 18, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (BROWN, DAVID)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT D. WHITNEY on behalf of Plaintiff ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (WHITNEY, ROBERT)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID LEONARD BROWN on behalf of Plaintiff ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (BROWN, DAVID)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2656571.), filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2018-2019 Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Application, #3 Exhibit 3 - May 7, 2019 ROR Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - June 25, 2019 Suppl. ROR Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - Aug. 26, 2019 Letter Rescinding the Policy, #6 Exhibit 6 - Aug. 16, 2019 Check, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(BROWN, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY v. CASEY'S AUTO SERVICE, INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: DAVID LEONARD BROWN
Represented By: ROBERT D. WHITNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey's Auto Service, Inc.
Represented By: ANTOINE G. MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Recovery Solutions of N.C., LLC
Represented By: ANTOINE G. MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?