WALLACE v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: STEPHEN F. WALLACE
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00964
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond. Defendant shall serve any response to Plaintiff's interrogatories and requests for production by 01/13/2020. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/15/2019. (AULD, L.)
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Request filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed by STEPHEN F. WALLACE. Replies due by 11/15/2019 (WALLACE, STEPHEN)
November 13, 2019 TEXT ORDER shortening response deadline as to #15 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to 11/15/2019, pursuant to Local Rule 7.3(f). Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/13/2019. (AULD, L.)
November 13, 2019 Motion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Request. (Engle, Anita)
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Request by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order granting Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond)(LEWIS, JAMES)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to State Farm by STEPHEN F. WALLACE.(WALLACE, STEPHEN)
October 30, 2019 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines. The parties propose the appropriate case-management track for this case established in LR 26.1 is Standard. Discovery due by 3/15/2020. Plaintiffs amended pleadings and joinder of parties due by 11/30/2019. Defendants amended pleadings and joinder of parties due by 12/30/2019. The parties do not agree to the reference of this case to a Magistrate Judge. ETT: approximately 1-2 days. A jury trial has been demanded. (Daniel, J)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Appointing DAVID L. BROWN, as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court.(Kemp, Donita)
October 30, 2019 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Mediation due by 5/15/2020.(Kemp, Donita)
October 30, 2019 TEXT ORDER adopting #12 Joint Rule 26(f) Report with the following clarification: the deadlines in Paragraph 2.f) apply not only to reports from retained experts, but also to any expert disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2)(C). Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 10/30/2019. (AULD, L.)
October 30, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #12 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.(LEWIS, JAMES)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by process as to All Defendants. (WALLACE, STEPHEN)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 11/25/2019 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Complaint, with Jury Demand by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (LEWIS, JAMES)
September 19, 2019 Case assigned to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 19, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Original document issued in Davidson County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS1942 and is listed as exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by STEPHEN F. WALLACE. (Original document filed in Davidson County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS1942 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal).(Coyne, Michelle)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DIANE K. PAPPAYLIOU on behalf of Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (PAPPAYLIOU, DIANE)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SHELLEY W. COLEMAN on behalf of Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (COLEMAN, SHELLEY)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (LEWIS, JAMES)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES SCOTT LEWIS on behalf of Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (LEWIS, JAMES)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against STEPHEN F WALLACE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2657622.), filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Davidson County Superior Court file, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(LEWIS, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALLACE v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: DIANE K. PAPPAYLIOU
Represented By: SHELLEY W. COLEMAN
Represented By: JAMES SCOTT LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN F. WALLACE
Represented By: STEPHEN F. WALLACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?