REID v. NCGA et al
Plaintiff: EMMANUEL REID
Defendant: MATTHEW MEINIG and NCGA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00984
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 CASE REFERRED RE: #4 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP filed by EMMANUEL REID to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (Sanders, Marlene)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Mailing Recommendation: Objections to R&R due by 11/12/2019. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 11/15/2019. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #1 Motion for Application to Proceed IFP, signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 10/28/2019. See #4 Order and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 10/28/2019; ORDERED that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entry of this Order. RECOMMENDED that the Complaint be dismissed as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). (Sheets, Jamie)
September 25, 2019 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 25, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against MATTHEW MEINIG, NCGA, filed by EMMANUEL REID.(Coyne, Michelle)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by EMMANUEL REID. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Coyne, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REID v. NCGA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW MEINIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMANUEL REID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?