AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY v. CAMERON et al
Plaintiff: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: QUADRE A. WILLIAMS, LINWOOD B. CAMERON, SR., KEITH WHITE, ANTHONY SHACKLEFORD, HENRY WADE and LBC LANDSCAPING SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01011
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to LINWOOD B. CAMERON, SR served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (TIERNEY, O.)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to KEITH WHITE served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (TIERNEY, O.)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to LBC LANDSCAPING SERVICES, INC. served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (TIERNEY, O.)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LINWOOD B. CAMERON, SR, LBC LANDSCAPING SERVICES, INC., ANTHONY SHACKLEFORD, HENRY WADE, KEITH WHITE, QUADRE A. WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Summons - LCB - Winstead, #2 Summons - LCB - McBride, #3 Summons - LCB - McBride 2, #4 Summons - Shackleford, #5 Summons - Wade, #6 Summons - White, #7 Summons - Williams) (Sheets, Jamie)
September 30, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 30, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (TIERNEY, O.)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2663797.), filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Time Demand Letters, #2 Exhibit Response to Demand, #3 Exhibit BAP Declarations, #4 Exhibit Umbrella Declarations)(TIERNEY, O.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY v. CAMERON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUADRE A. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINWOOD B. CAMERON, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY SHACKLEFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRY WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LBC LANDSCAPING SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: O. CRAIG TIERNEY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?