DANZY v. COLOPLAST CORP. et al
Plaintiff: JUANITA DANZY
Defendant: COLOPLAST A/S, PORGES S.A., MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC, COLOPLAST CORP., COLOPLAST MANUFACTURING US, LLC and DIVERSIFIED PLASTICS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01017
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BEN C. MARTIN on behalf of Plaintiff JUANITA DANZY (MARTIN, BEN)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LAURA J. BAUGHMAN on behalf of Plaintiff JUANITA DANZY (BAUGHMAN, LAURA)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by JUANITA DANZY. COLOPLAST CORP. waiver sent on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (FUERST, RACHEL)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to COLOPLAST CORP., COLOPLAST A/S, COLOPLAST MANUFACTURING US, LLC, DIVERSIFIED PLASTICS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Coloplast A/S, #2 Summons - Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC, #3 Summons - Diversified Plastics, Inc.) (Sheets, Jamie)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by JUANITA DANZY.(FUERST, RACHEL)
October 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 2, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JUANITA DANZY. Filing Fee $400.00 paid. Receipt number: 0418-2666314. (FUERST, RACHEL) Modified on 10/2/2019 to add in receipt information. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DANZY v. COLOPLAST CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLOPLAST A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORGES S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLOPLAST CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLOPLAST MANUFACTURING US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIVERSIFIED PLASTICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUANITA DANZY
Represented By: RACHEL A. FUERST
Represented By: BEN C. MARTIN
Represented By: LAURA J. BAUGHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?