WOODS v. CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Plaintiff: ALICIA WOODS
Defendant: CHERYL CARNAHAN, ELIZABETH CLARY, RONNIE JACKSON, NANCY KUEFFER and CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01018
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for RONNIE JACKSON. Answer due by 12/9/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 11/8/2019. (Brubaker, John)
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by RONNIE JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HALL, JONATHAN)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JONATHAN E. HALL on behalf of Defendants CHERYL CARNAHAN, ELIZABETH CLARY, RONNIE JACKSON, NANCY KUEFFER (HALL, JONATHAN)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION. Answer due by 12/4/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 11/4/2019. (Brubaker, John)
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HARTZOG, KATIE)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION. (HARTZOG, KATIE)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL B. COHEN on behalf of Defendant CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION (COHEN, MICHAEL)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KATIE WEAVER HARTZOG on behalf of Defendant CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION (HARTZOG, KATIE)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT HENRY JESSUP, IV on behalf of Plaintiff ALICIA WOODS (JESSUP, ROBERT)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALICIA WOODS. NANCY KUEFFER waiver sent on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (JESSUP, ROBERT)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALICIA WOODS. CHERYL CARNAHAN waiver sent on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (JESSUP, ROBERT)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 10/04/2019, granting #3 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Alicia Woods is appointed Guardian Ad Litem for the minor, R.W., to appear for him in this action and prosecute it on his behalf. (Taylor, Abby)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CHERYL CARNAHAN, CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION, ELIZABETH CLARY, RONNIE JACKSON, NANCY KUEFFER. (Attachments: #1 Summons - CHERYL CARNAHAN, #2 Summons - ELIZABETH CLARY, #3 Summons - RONNIE JACKSON, #4 Summons - CHCCS Board of Education c/o Pamela Baldwin, Superintendent, #5 Summons - CHCCS Board of Education c/o Margaret Samuels, Chair of CHCCS Board of Education) (Sheets, Jamie)
October 3, 2019 Motion Submitted: #3 First MOTION to Appoint ad Litem to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
October 2, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION to Appoint ad Litem by ALICIA WOODS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JESSUP, ROBERT)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(JESSUP, ROBERT)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2666454), filed by ALICIA WOODS. (JESSUP, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOODS v. CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL CARNAHAN
Represented By: JONATHAN E. HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH CLARY
Represented By: JONATHAN E. HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONNIE JACKSON
Represented By: JONATHAN E. HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY KUEFFER
Represented By: JONATHAN E. HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: KATIE WEAVER HARTZOG
Represented By: MICHAEL B. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICIA WOODS
Represented By: ROBERT HENRY JESSUP, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?