KLINGENBURG v. KLINGENBURG USA LLC
Plaintiff: MELISSA EICKEMEIER KLINGENBURG
Defendant: KLINGENBURG USA LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01030
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: N C TILLEY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Case Reported Settled by Attorney David Lindsay. Stipulation of Dismissal due by 12/23/2019. (Winchester, Robin)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for KLINGENBURG USA LLC. Answer due by 11/25/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 11/11/2019. (Brubaker, John)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint by KLINGENBURG USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LINDSAY, DAVID)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for KLINGENBURG USA LLC. Answer due by 11/11/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/10/2019. (Brubaker, John)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint by KLINGENBURG USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(LINDSAY, DAVID)
October 8, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 7, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to KLINGENBURG USA LLC. (Original document issued in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS958 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against KLINGENBURG USA LLC, filed by MELISSA EICKEMEIER KLINGENBURG. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS958 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant Klingenburg USA LLC (LINDSAY, DAVID)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant Klingenburg USA LLC (LINDSAY, DAVID)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID C. LINDSAY on behalf of Defendant Klingenburg USA LLC (LINDSAY, DAVID)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against MELISSA EICKEMEIER KLINGENBURG (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2669773), filed by KLINGENBURG USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint in State Court) (LINDSAY, DAVID) Modified on 10/7/2019 to add filing fee information. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KLINGENBURG v. KLINGENBURG USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA EICKEMEIER KLINGENBURG
Represented By: JACK A. KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLINGENBURG USA LLC
Represented By: DAVID C. LINDSAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?