AGNER v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: VONNIE K. AGNER
Defendant: FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, GRINNELL LLC, GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), INC., AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, CRANE CO., COVIL CORPORATION, DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, NELES-JAMESBURY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, AURORA PUMP COMPANY, CROSBY VALVE, LLC, CARRIER CORPORATION, SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC., FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY, ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, ITT CORPORATION, SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC., THE NEW YORK BLOWER COMPANY, BW/IP, INC., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY, WARREN PUMPS, LLC and CBS CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01033
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant CARRIER CORPORATION (STARR, WILLIAM)
November 21, 2019 Filing 97 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CARRIER CORPORATION. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
November 21, 2019 Filing 96 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CARRIER CORPORATION. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
November 21, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TRACY E. TOMLIN on behalf of Defendant CARRIER CORPORATION (TOMLIN, TRACY)
November 19, 2019 Filing 94 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by THE NEW YORK BLOWER COMPANY. (HOLDEN, JOHN)
November 18, 2019 Filing 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NELES-JAMESBURY, INC.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
November 18, 2019 Filing 92 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by NELES-JAMESBURY, INC.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
November 7, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL on behalf of Defendant AURORA PUMP COMPANY (O'NEILL, M.)
November 7, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL on behalf of Defendant CROSBY VALVE, LLC (O'NEILL, M.)
November 7, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL on behalf of Defendant FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC (O'NEILL, M.)
November 7, 2019 Filing 88 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AURORA PUMP COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AURORA PUMP COMPANY for AURORA PUMP COMPANY.. (SULLIVAN, KIMBERLY)
November 6, 2019 Filing 87 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
November 6, 2019 Filing 86 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. (PECK, TIMOTHY) (Main Document 86 replaced on 11/7/2019 with corrected image) (Sheets, Jamie)
November 6, 2019 Filing 85 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
November 6, 2019 Filing 84 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
November 6, 2019 Filing 83 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BW/IP, INC. identifying Corporate Parent BW/IP, INC. for BW/IP, INC... (BROWN, TERRY)
November 6, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES G. KENNEDY on behalf of Defendant SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC. (KENNEDY, JAMES)
November 4, 2019 Filing 81 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS CORPORATION. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
November 4, 2019 Filing 80 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CBS CORPORATION. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
November 4, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant ITT CORPORATION (STARR, WILLIAM)
November 4, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), INC. (STARR, WILLIAM)
November 4, 2019 Filing 77 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ITT CORPORATION. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
November 4, 2019 Filing 76 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ITT CORPORATION. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
November 4, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TRACY E. TOMLIN on behalf of Defendant ITT CORPORATION (TOMLIN, TRACY)
November 4, 2019 Filing 74 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), INC.. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
November 4, 2019 Filing 73 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), INC.. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
November 4, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TRACY E. TOMLIN on behalf of Defendant GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), INC. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
November 4, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC (STARR, WILLIAM)
November 4, 2019 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
November 4, 2019 Filing 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AURORA PUMP COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AURORA PUMP COMPANY for AURORA PUMP COMPANY.. (SULLIVAN, KIMBERLY)
November 4, 2019 Filing 68 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
November 4, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TRACY E. TOMLIN on behalf of Defendant ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC (TOMLIN, TRACY)
November 4, 2019 Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by AURORA PUMP COMPANY. (SULLIVAN, KIMBERLY)
November 4, 2019 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BW/IP, INC. identifying Corporate Parent BW/IP, INC. for BW/IP, INC... (BROWN, TERRY)
November 4, 2019 Filing 64 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BW/IP, INC.. (BROWN, TERRY)
November 4, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SCOTTIE F. LEE on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (LEE, SCOTTIE)
November 4, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CURTIS J. SHIPLEY on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (SHIPLEY, CURTIS)
November 4, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LESLIE C. PACKER on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (PACKER, LESLIE)
November 4, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ASHLEY KAMPHAUS BRATHWAITE on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
November 4, 2019 Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COVIL CORPORATION. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
November 4, 2019 Filing 58 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by COVIL CORPORATION. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
November 4, 2019 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
November 4, 2019 Filing 56 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
November 1, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RYAN M. ARNOLD on behalf of Defendant NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (ARNOLD, RYAN)
November 1, 2019 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CROSBY VALVE, LLC. (SULLIVAN, KIMBERLY)
November 1, 2019 Filing 53 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (OAKLEY, DAVID)
November 1, 2019 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY (OAKLEY, DAVID)
November 1, 2019 Filing 51 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CROSBY VALVE, LLC. (SULLIVAN, KIMBERLY)
November 1, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID B. OAKLEY on behalf of Defendant THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY (OAKLEY, DAVID)
November 1, 2019 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (SULLIVAN, KIMBERLY)
November 1, 2019 Filing 48 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (SULLIVAN, KIMBERLY)
November 1, 2019 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant WARREN PUMPS, LLC by WARREN PUMPS, LLC.(BENNETT, JOSHUA)
November 1, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by WARREN PUMPS, LLC. (BENNETT, JOSHUA)
November 1, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RHYAN J. LINDLEY on behalf of Defendant FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC (LINDLEY, RHYAN)
November 1, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RHYAN J. LINDLEY on behalf of Defendant CROSBY VALVE, LLC (LINDLEY, RHYAN)
November 1, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PHILIP C. REID on behalf of Defendant CROSBY VALVE, LLC (REID, PHILIP)
November 1, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PHILIP C. REID on behalf of Defendant FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC (REID, PHILIP)
November 1, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JASMINE M. PITT on behalf of Defendant WARREN PUMPS, LLC (PITT, JASMINE)
November 1, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CRANE CO.. (MATHER, EMILY)
November 1, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SCOTT E. FRICK on behalf of Defendants DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY (FRICK, SCOTT)
November 1, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney W. DAVID CONNER on behalf of Defendants DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY (CONNER, W.)
November 1, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MOFFATT G. MCDONALD on behalf of Defendants DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY (MCDONALD, MOFFATT)
November 1, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
November 1, 2019 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
November 1, 2019 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
November 1, 2019 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
November 1, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
November 1, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
November 1, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
November 1, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
November 1, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
November 1, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
October 31, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (STARR, WILLIAM)
October 31, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant GRINNELL LLC (STARR, WILLIAM)
October 31, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION.(TOMLIN, TRACY)
October 31, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
October 31, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TRACY E. TOMLIN on behalf of Defendant AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (TOMLIN, TRACY)
October 31, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant GRINNELL LLC by GRINNELL LLC.(TOMLIN, TRACY)
October 31, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GRINNELL LLC. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TRACY E. TOMLIN on behalf of Defendant GRINNELL LLC (TOMLIN, TRACY)
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION for NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KELLY, CHRISTOPHER)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KELLY, CHRISTOPHER)
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STEPHEN B. WILLIAMSON on behalf of Defendant SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLTRAIN, KEITH)
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and to Cross-Claims of any and all other Defendants and Third-Party Defendants by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLTRAIN, KEITH)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CRANE CO.. (MATHER, EMILY)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney EMILY K. MATHER on behalf of Defendant CRANE CO. (MATHER, EMILY)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARLA T. RESCHLY on behalf of Defendant CRANE CO. (RESCHLY, MARLA)
October 28, 2019 Case Reassigned to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER as referral judge. MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE no longer assigned to the case. (Powell, Gloria)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE NEW YORK BLOWER COMPANY. (HOLDEN, JOHN)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for THE NEW YORK BLOWER COMPANY. Answer due by 12/1/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/23/2019. (Brubaker, John)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by THE NEW YORK BLOWER COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(HOLDEN, JOHN)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN T. HOLDEN on behalf of Defendant THE NEW YORK BLOWER COMPANY (HOLDEN, JOHN)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOSHUA HAMILTON BENNETT on behalf of Defendant WARREN PUMPS, LLC (BENNETT, JOSHUA)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER M. KELLY on behalf of Defendant NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (KELLY, CHRISTOPHER)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BENJAMIN D. BRALY on behalf of Plaintiff VONNIE K. AGNER (BRALY, BENJAMIN)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 9, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 9, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2670736), filed by VONNIE K. AGNER. (GRAHAM, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGNER v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By: PHILIP C. REID
Represented By: RHYAN J. LINDLEY
Represented By: KIMBERLY SULLIVAN
Represented By: M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL LLC
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), INC.
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: MARLA T. RESCHLY
Represented By: EMILY K. MATHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COVIL CORPORATION
Represented By: SCOTTIE F. LEE
Represented By: LESLIE C. PACKER
Represented By: ASHLEY KAMPHAUS BRATHWAITE
Represented By: CURTIS J. SHIPLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NELES-JAMESBURY, INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: KIMBERLY SULLIVAN
Represented By: M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROSBY VALVE, LLC
Represented By: PHILIP C. REID
Represented By: RHYAN J. LINDLEY
Represented By: KIMBERLY SULLIVAN
Represented By: M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC.
Represented By: JAMES G. KENNEDY
Represented By: STEPHEN B. WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY
Represented By: DAVID B. OAKLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT CORPORATION
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NEW YORK BLOWER COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN T. HOLDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, INC.
Represented By: TERRY M. BROWN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: KEITH E. COLTRAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: RYAN M. ARNOLD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC
Represented By: JOSHUA HAMILTON BENNETT
Represented By: JASMINE M. PITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VONNIE K. AGNER
Represented By: WILLIAM MARC GRAHAM
Represented By: BENJAMIN D. BRALY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?