PENNSYLVANIA MANUFACTURERS' ASSOCIATION INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: PENNSYLVANIA MANUFACTURERS' ASSOCIATION INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv01045
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: N C TILLEY
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by PENNSYLVANIA MANUFACTURERS' ASSOCIATION INSURANCE COMPANY.(SANTANIELLO, ANDREW)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 1/16/2020 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PENNSYLVANIA MANUFACTURERS' ASSOCIATION INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent OLD REPUBLIC INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, Corporate Parent PMA COMPANIES, INC. for PENNSYLVANIA MANUFACTURERS' ASSOCIATION INSURANCE COMPANY.. (SANTANIELLO, ANDREW)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney A. CHARLES ELLIS on behalf of Defendant NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY (ELLIS, A.)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY. (ELLIS, A.)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY. (ELLIS, A.)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (SANTANIELLO, ANDREW)
October 16, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 15, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Sheets, Jamie)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2673653), filed by PENNSYLVANIA MANUFACTURERS' ASSOCIATION INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opioid lead case, #2 Exhibit B - opioid case list, #3 Exhibit C - Jones County litigation, #4 Exhibit D - Insurance Policy) (SANTANIELLO, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PENNSYLVANIA MANUFACTURERS' ASSOCIATION INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY
Represented By: A. CHARLES ELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENNSYLVANIA MANUFACTURERS' ASSOCIATION INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ANDREW J. SANTANIELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?