HONDA JET LIMITED, L.L.C. v. HONDA AIRCRAFT COMPANY, LLC
Plaintiff: Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C.
Defendant: Honda Aircraft Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01046
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #15 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
December 12, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by HONDA JET LIMITED, L.L.C..(DEGEORGE, R.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 1/9/2020 (Winchester, Robin)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MACK H. SHULTZ, JR on behalf of Defendant HONDA AIRCRAFT COMPANY, LLC (SHULTZ, MACK)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM BRENDAN MURPHY on behalf of Defendant HONDA AIRCRAFT COMPANY, LLC (MURPHY, WILLIAM)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 12/16/2019 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by HONDA AIRCRAFT COMPANY, LLC. (MOHR, PHILIP)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Association of Attorney by PHILIP J. MOHR on behalf of Defendant HONDA AIRCRAFT COMPANY, LLC (MOHR, PHILIP) Modified on 11/6/2019 to mark as Filed in Error and to remove document from public view. Attorney instructed to properly re-file. (Garland, Leah)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Association of Attorney by PHILIP J. MOHR on behalf of Defendant HONDA AIRCRAFT COMPANY, LLC (MOHR, PHILIP) Modified on 11/6/2019 to mark as Filed in Error and to remove document from public view. Attorney instructed to properly re-file. (Garland, Leah)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PHILIP J. MOHR on behalf of Defendant HONDA AIRCRAFT COMPANY, LLC (MOHR, PHILIP)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to HONDA AIRCRAFT COMPANY, LLC served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (DEGEORGE, R.)
October 16, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 16, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 15, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Sheets, Jamie)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to HONDA AIRCRAFT COMPANY, LLC. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 - Civil Cover Sheet. (DEGEORGE, R.)
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff HONDA JET LIMITED, L.L.C. (DEGEORGE, R.)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HONDA AIRCRAFT COMPANY, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2673674), filed by HONDA JET LIMITED, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (DEGEORGE, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HONDA JET LIMITED, L.L.C. v. HONDA AIRCRAFT COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C.
Represented By: R. STEVEN DEGEORGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Aircraft Company, LLC
Represented By: PHILIP J. MOHR
Represented By: WILLIAM BRENDAN MURPHY
Represented By: MACK H. SHULTZ, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?