BOWDEN v. 21ST JUDICIAL DISTRICT OFFICE et al
Plaintiff: FRANKLIN BOWDEN, JR.
Defendant: LISA S. COSTNER, DAVID SIPPRELL, OFFICE OF INDIGENT DEFENSE SERVICES, MARK T. CUMMINGS, WILLIAM Z. WOODS, 21ST PROSECUTORIAL DISTRICT OFFICE, DISTRICT ATTORNEY JIM O'NEILL, FORSYTH COUNTY, DON D. CARTER, DAVID L. HALL, 21ST JUDICIAL DISTRICT OFFICE and JERRY JORDAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv01102
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion requesting an extension of time to file objections to #4 Recommendation. Plaintiff shall file any objections to #4 Recommendation by 12/26/2019. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 12/04/2019. (AULD, L.)
December 4, 2019 Motion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Engle, Anita)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by FRANKLIN BOWDEN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Garland, Leah)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Mailing Recommendation: Objections to R&R due by 12/2/2019. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 12/5/2019. (Garland, Leah)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/14/2019, that in forma pauperis status be granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty (20) days from the date of this Order Plaintiff make an initial filing fee payment of $16.67. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's trust officer shall be directed to pay to the Clerk of this Court 20% of all deposits to his account starting with the month of December of 2019, and thereafter each time that the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the $350.00 filing fee has been paid. (Garland, Leah)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/14/2019, that in forma pauperis status be granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty (20) days from the date of this Order Plaintiff make an initial filing fee payment of $16.67. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's trust officer shall be directed to pay to the Clerk of this Court 20% of all deposits to his account starting with the month of December 0f 2019, and thereafter each time that the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the $350.00 filing fee has been paid. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A for being frivolous or malicious or for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, as well as for seeking monetary relief against a defendant who is immune from such relief. (Garland, Leah)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by FRANKLIN BOWDEN, JR. Address updated on docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Garland, Leah)
October 30, 2019 CASE REFERRED for Screening (Taylor, Abby)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by FRANKLIN BOWDEN, JR.(Taylor, Abby)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by FRANKLIN BOWDEN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOWDEN v. 21ST JUDICIAL DISTRICT OFFICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA S. COSTNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID SIPPRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF INDIGENT DEFENSE SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK T. CUMMINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM Z. WOODS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21ST PROSECUTORIAL DISTRICT OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT ATTORNEY JIM O'NEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORSYTH COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DON D. CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID L. HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21ST JUDICIAL DISTRICT OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRY JORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKLIN BOWDEN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?