FARMER v. DOE #1 et al
Plaintiff: DEE DEIDRE FARMER
Defendant: DUKE REGIONAL HOSPITAL and JANE DOE #1
Case Number: 1:2019cv01111
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 CASE REFERRED for Screening. (Coyne, Michelle)
November 6, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:19-cv-03172. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/4/2019. (c/m 11/5/2019)(ko, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/5/2019.]
November 4, 2019 Case transferred to District of Middle District of North Carolina. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (ko, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/5/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dee Deidre Farmer(ko, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/5/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jane Doe #1, Duke Regional Hospital, filed by Dee Deidre Farmer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ko, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FARMER v. DOE #1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEE DEIDRE FARMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUKE REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?