BANILLA GAMES, INC. et al v. TNT AMUSEMENTS, LLC
Plaintiff: GROVER GAMING, INC. and BANILLA GAMES, INC.
Defendant: TNT AMUSEMENTS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01113
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
2 Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
3 Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 2/24/2020 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
January 2, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by TNT AMUSEMENTS, LLC. (LUFT, RYAN)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for TNT AMUSEMENTS, LLC. Answer due by 1/2/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 11/26/2019. (Brubaker, John)
November 25, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by TNT AMUSEMENTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(LUFT, RYAN)
November 18, 2019 Receipt of Funds in the amount of $ 250.00. Receipt number: NCM048203. (See #17 Consent Preliminary Injunction) (Garland, Leah)
November 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Cancellation : Motion Hearing, Re: #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by GROVER GAMING, INC. set for 11/15/2019 at 02:00 PM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 11/15/2019, granting #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, as set out herein.(Butler, Carol)
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RYAN S. LUFT on behalf of Defendant TNT AMUSEMENTS, LLC (LUFT, RYAN)
November 15, 2019 Motion Submitted: #15 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Preliminary Injunction) to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Preliminary Injunction) by BANILLA GAMES, INC., GROVER GAMING, INC.. Response to Motion due by 12/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Preliminary Injunction)(SCHOUTEN, JOSEPH)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to TNT AMUSEMENTS, LLC served on 11/8/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(SCHOUTEN, JOSEPH)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing, Re: #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by GROVER GAMING, INC. set for 11/15/2019 at 02:00 PM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Sheets, Jamie)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to TNT AMUSEMENTS, LLC. (Sheets, Jamie)
November 7, 2019 Case Reassigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER were assigned in error. (Powell, Gloria)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER S. EDWARDS on behalf of Plaintiffs BANILLA GAMES, INC., GROVER GAMING, INC. (EDWARDS, CHRISTOPHER)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1 Complaint,, Summons to TNT Amusements, LLC. (SCHOUTEN, JOSEPH)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff Grover Gaming, Inc. re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and, Thereafter, Preliminary Injunction, and Motion for Expedited Review filed by Grover Gaming, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Joshua Askew, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHOUTEN, JOSEPH)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and, Thereafter, Preliminary Injunction, and Motion for Expedited Review by GROVER GAMING, INC. (SCHOUTEN, JOSEPH)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GROVER GAMING, INC (SCHOUTEN, JOSEPH)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BANILLA GAMES, INC. (SCHOUTEN, JOSEPH)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOSEPH A. SCHOUTEN on behalf of Plaintiffs BANILLA GAMES, INC., GROVER GAMING, INC. (SCHOUTEN, JOSEPH)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1 Complaint,, Civil Cover Sheet. (SCHOUTEN, JOSEPH)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TNT AMUSEMENTS, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2690501), filed by BANILLA GAMES, INC., GROVER GAMING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Grover Gaming, Inc. Fusion 1, 2, 3 - CRC Codes, #2 Exhibit B- TNT Amusements Fusion 1, 2, 3 - CRC Codes, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Registration - Crumble Cave, #4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Registration - Sparky's Firehouse, #5 Exhibit E - Certificate of Registration - Mountain of Fire, #6 Exhibit F - Certificate of Registration - Fusion Game, #7 Exhibit G - Non-Disclosure Agreement) (SCHOUTEN, JOSEPH)
November 6, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
November 6, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BANILLA GAMES, INC. et al v. TNT AMUSEMENTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GROVER GAMING, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. EDWARDS
Represented By: JOSEPH A. SCHOUTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANILLA GAMES, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. EDWARDS
Represented By: JOSEPH A. SCHOUTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TNT AMUSEMENTS, LLC
Represented By: RYAN S. LUFT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?