WOHLFORD et al v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: MARGARET WOHLFORD and LARRY WOHLFORD
Defendant: STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY and STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv01124
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Appointing ROBERT A. BEASON as the mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Gammon, Cheryl)
January 7, 2020 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER ; Mediation due by 7/31/2020. (Gammon, Cheryl)
January 7, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. (Gammon, Cheryl)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 12/27/2019. The parties Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Doc. #14 is approved as submitted and as noted herein. The parties propose the appropriate case-management track for this case established in LR 26.1 is Complex. Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2020. Mediation due by 7/31/2020. The parties agree the mediator shall be Robert Beason. Plaintiffs amended pleadings and joinder of parties due by 2/15/2020. Defendants amended pleadings and joinder of parties due by 3/15/2020.The parties do not agree to the reference of this case to a Magistrate Judge. ETT: approximately 4-5 days. A jury trial has been demanded. (Daniel, J)
December 19, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #14 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.(LEWIS, JAMES)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 1/16/2020 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #6 Complaint, with Jury Demand by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (LEWIS, JAMES)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal of State Farm General Insurance Company by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (LEWIS, JAMES)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney REBECCA H. UGOLICK on behalf of Plaintiffs LARRY WOHLFORD, MARGARET WOHLFORD (UGOLICK, REBECCA)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT HENRY JESSUP, IV on behalf of Plaintiffs LARRY WOHLFORD, MARGARET WOHLFORD (JESSUP, ROBERT)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY and STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Answer due by 12/9/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 11/12/2019. (Brubaker, John)
November 12, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
November 12, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Original document filed in Moore County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS1260 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed by MARGARET WOHLFORD, LARRY WOHLFORD. (Original document filed in Moore County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS1260 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Removal, by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order granting extension of time)(LEWIS, JAMES)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SHELLEY W. COLEMAN on behalf of Defendants STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (COLEMAN, SHELLEY)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES SCOTT LEWIS on behalf of Defendants STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (LEWIS, JAMES)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY for STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.. (LEWIS, JAMES)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2693440.), filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Moore County Superior Court file, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(LEWIS, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOHLFORD et al v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET WOHLFORD
Represented By: REBECCA H. UGOLICK
Represented By: ROBERT HENRY JESSUP, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY WOHLFORD
Represented By: REBECCA H. UGOLICK
Represented By: ROBERT HENRY JESSUP, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: SHELLEY W. COLEMAN
Represented By: JAMES SCOTT LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: SHELLEY W. COLEMAN
Represented By: JAMES SCOTT LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?