FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. CADET CONTRUCTION COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Cadet Logistics, LLC, Cadet Construction Company and Charette J. Miller
Case Number: 1:2019cv01125
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaim for FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Answer due by 1/17/2020. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/31/2019. (Brubaker, John)
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaim by FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CHAPIN, ANDREW)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against by CHARETTE J. MILLER, CADET LOGISTICS, LLC, CADET CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. (JONES, TODD)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for All Defendants. Answer due by 12/13/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/6/2019. (Brubaker, John)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by CADET CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, CADET LOGISTICS, LLC, CHARETTE J. MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JONES, TODD)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TODD ALLEN JONES on behalf of Defendants CADET CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, CADET LOGISTICS, LLC, CHARETTE J. MILLER (JONES, TODD)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LINDSEY E. POWELL on behalf of Defendants CADET CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, CADET LOGISTICS, LLC, CHARETTE J. MILLER (POWELL, LINDSEY)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to CADET LOGISTICS, LLC served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(CHAPIN, ANDREW)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to CADET CONSTRUCTION COMPANY served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Delivery Exception Notice, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service)(CHAPIN, ANDREW)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to CHARETTE J. MILLER served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(CHAPIN, ANDREW)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CADET CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, CADET LOGISTICS, LLC, CHARETTE J. MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Logistics, #2 Cadet)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 12, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
November 12, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
November 12, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (CHAPIN, ANDREW)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANDREW LOWELL CHAPIN on behalf of Plaintiff Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company (CHAPIN, ANDREW)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2693530.), filed by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - General Agreement of Indemnity)(CHAPIN, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. CADET CONTRUCTION COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadet Logistics, LLC
Represented By: LINDSEY E. POWELL
Represented By: TODD ALLEN JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadet Construction Company
Represented By: LINDSEY E. POWELL
Represented By: TODD ALLEN JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charette J. Miller
Represented By: LINDSEY E. POWELL
Represented By: TODD ALLEN JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: ANDREW LOWELL CHAPIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?