MAY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: MESSIAH [NMN] MAY
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01127
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 18:3114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND JUDGMENT, signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 12/20/2019, that this action is filed and dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to the plaintiff filing a civil complaint, on the proper Motion for Return of Property forms, which corrects the defects cited in the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation or to instead seeking remedies in the state courts. A certificate of appealability shall not issue.(Taylor, Abby)
December 16, 2019 Case Referred re: #2 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #1 MOTION for Return of Property filed by MESSIAH [NMN] MAY, to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Mailing Recommendation: Objections to R&R due by 12/2/2019. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 12/5/2019. (Garland, Leah)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/14/2019, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order. The Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff Motion for Return of Property forms, instructions, an application to proceed in forma pauperis, and a copy of pertinent parts of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 (i.e. Sections (a) & (d)). (Garland, Leah)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/14/2019, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order. The Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff Motion for Return of Property forms, instructions, an application to proceed in forma pauperis, and a copy of pertinent parts of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 (i.e. Sections (a) & (d)). IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be filed and dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a civil complaint, on the proper Motion for Return of Property forms, which corrects the defects cited above or to instead seeking remedies in the state courts. (Garland, Leah)
November 12, 2019 CASE REFERRED for Screening. (Garland, Leah)
November 12, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garland, Leah)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Return of Property filed by MESSIAH [NMN] MAY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MESSIAH [NMN] MAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: ANGELA HEWLETT MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?