JENNINGS v. DARROW, et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Jennings and Mustafa Beezy Bey
Defendant: R. Lounsberry and Carol Scribner Darrow
Case Number: 1:2019cv01133
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:19-ct-03244. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Transferring Case to the Middle District of North Carolina. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 11/13/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Brandon Jennings to Piedmont Regional Jail. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 Amended Fed.R.Civ.P. 15 Jurisdiction filed by Brandon Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 Writ of Replevin filed by Brandon Jennings. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Love, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Correct Addresses for Defendants filed by Brandon Jennings. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Love, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Case Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle for initial review. Motions Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #6 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint and #8 MOTION for Subpoena. (Love, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/30/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Brandon Jennings Piedmont Regional Jail and Trust Fund Officer at Piedmont Regional Jail. (Love, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Love, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Subpoena filed by Brandon Jennings. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Love, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Love, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint filed by Brandon Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Sequestration, #2 Envelope) (Love, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Love, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 9/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/19/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Brandon Jennings Piedmont Regional Jail and Trust Fund Officer at Piedmont Regional Jail. (Love, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Brandon Jennings at Piedmont Regional Jail. (Love, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Brandon Jennings. (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carol Scribner Darrow and R. Lounsberry filed by Brandon Jennings. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JENNINGS v. DARROW, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mustafa Beezy Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Lounsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Scribner Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?