LEE et al v. EWART et al
Plaintiff: RONNIE W. LEE, II and AKRESHA LEE
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, PROFESSIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC., LARRY WAYNE EWART, UNITED LEASING, INC. and UNITED LEASING LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01154
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by LARRY WAYNE EWART, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, PROFESSIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (KELLY, CHRISTOPHER)
January 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) UNITED LEASING LLC, filed by Plaintiffs AKRESHA LEE, RONNIE W. LEE, II (FRANCIS, DANIEL)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 1/16/2020. The Motion for Withdrawal (Doc. #9 ) is GRANTED, and Reid L. Phillips and Andrew L. Rodenbough are withdrawn as counsel for Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Daniel, J)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RYAN M. ARNOLD on behalf of Defendants LARRY WAYNE EWART, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, PROFESSIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC., UNITED LEASING LLC (ARNOLD, RYAN)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by counsel (for First Amended Complaint) on behalf of Defendants Larry Wayne Ewart, Professional Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company and United Leasing, LLC on Janaury 9, 2020. (KELLY, CHRISTOPHER)
January 8, 2020 Motion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: #9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney REID L. PHILLIPS. (Engle, Anita)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney REID L. PHILLIPS by on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. Responses due by 1/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PHILLIPS, REID)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER M. KELLY on behalf of Defendants LARRY WAYNE EWART, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, PROFESSIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC., UNITED LEASING LLC, UNITED LEASING, INC. (KELLY, CHRISTOPHER)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to UNITED LEASING LLC. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS against defendant All Defendants, filed by RONNIE W. LEE, II, AKRESHA LEE.(FRANCIS, DANIEL)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. Answer due by 1/17/2020. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/11/2019. (Brubaker, John)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PHILLIPS, REID)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney REID L. PHILLIPS on behalf of Defendant NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (PHILLIPS, REID)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LARRY WAYNE EWART, PROFESSIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC., UNITED LEASING, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Professional Transportation, Inc., #2 Summons - United Leasing, Inc., #3 Summons - Norfolk Southern Railway Company) (Sheets, Jamie)
November 25, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
November 22, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by RONNIE W. LEE, II, AKRESHA LEE. Filing Fee $400.00 paid. Receipt number: 0418-2700851. (FRANCIS, DANIEL) Modified on 11/22/2019 to add in filing fee information. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEE et al v. EWART et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONNIE W. LEE, II
Represented By: DANIEL R. FRANCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AKRESHA LEE
Represented By: DANIEL R. FRANCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: REID L. PHILLIPS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. KELLY
Represented By: RYAN M. ARNOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROFESSIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. KELLY
Represented By: RYAN M. ARNOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY WAYNE EWART
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. KELLY
Represented By: RYAN M. ARNOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED LEASING, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED LEASING LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. KELLY
Represented By: RYAN M. ARNOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?