MAY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: MESSIAH [NMN] MAY
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01156
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 18:3114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Receipt of Funds in the amount of $ 76.00. Receipt number: NCM048876. (Garland, Leah)
December 19, 2019 TEXT ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina, for the reasons stated in a separate Text Order entered this day. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 12/19/2019. (AULD, L.)
December 19, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Letter Motion, filed by Plaintiff requesting clarification regarding payment of the filing fee in this case and proper venue, in that the Court advises Plaintiff (A) that #3 Order relieved him only of the obligation to make an initial partial payment, but required him to pay the filing fee in installments from his inmate trust account; and (B) that venue belongs in the district where the seizure of his property occurred and that the Court therefore will transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina, in light of Plaintiff's representations in #4 Letter Motion that his "property was seized in the Eastern District Raleigh Wake County." Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 12/19/2019. (AULD, L.)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Clarification re: #3 Order, filed by MESSIAH [NMN] MAY. Responses due by 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Garland, Leah)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/26/2019, that Plaintiff in the above-named action be, and is hereby, permitted to file and prosecute said action in this Court without prepayment of fees or giving security therefor, subject to the conditions set forth below. FURTHER ORDERED that, as a condition of Plaintiff's proceeding in forma pauperis, Plaintiff's current custodian and/or trust officer shall, starting with the month of December of 2019, collect, set aside, and pay from Plaintiff's trust account on a continuing basis 20 percent of the deposits to Plaintiff's account until the full filing fee and any costs, should they be assessed at a later date, have been paid in full. Unless the Court orders otherwise and except for final payment, such payments shall be made each time the set aside balance in Plaintiff's account exceeds $10.00 until the $350.00 filing fee has been paid. FURTHER ORDERED that all payments deducted in relation to this case shall be designated as made in payment of the filing fee for Civil Action No. 1:19CV1156, and shall be paid to the Clerk, U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina. In the event Plaintiff is transferred to another institution, the balance due shall be collected and paid to the Clerk by the custodian at Plaintiff's next institution. A copy of this Order shall be sent to Plaintiff's current custodian. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall prepare summonses addressed to the United States Attorney for the Middle District of North Carolina and the Attorney General of the United States, as provided in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i)(1). FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshal shall serve the summonses and copies of the Complaint. (Garland, Leah)
November 22, 2019 CASE REFERRED for Screening. (Garland, Leah)
November 22, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garland, Leah)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Return of Property filed by MESSIAH [NMN] MAY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Garland, Leah)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by MESSIAH [NMN] MAY. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MESSIAH [NMN] MAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: ANGELA HEWLETT MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?