MOODY v. MEDTRONIC, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JIMMY L. MOODY
Defendant: MEDTRONIC, INC. and MEDTRONIC USA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01216
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend #2 Complaint Plaintiff's Motion in the Alternative to Amend Complaint by JIMMY L. MOODY. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(JENKINS, ROBERT)
January 31, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand by Plaintiff JIMMY L. MOODY. (JENKINS, ROBERT)
January 31, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court by JIMMY L. MOODY. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2020 (JENKINS, ROBERT)
January 31, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. Memorandum in Opposition of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by JIMMY L. MOODY. Replies due by 2/14/2020 (JENKINS, ROBERT)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER issued by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 1/13/20: GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File and extending the time to file brief in opposition to 1/31/2020. (Sanders, Marlene)
January 13, 2020 Motions Submitted: #14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JIMMY L. MOODY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JENKINS, ROBERT)
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT O. JENKINS on behalf of Plaintiff JIMMY L. MOODY (JENKINS, ROBERT)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC.. (JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC.. Response to Motion due by 1/10/2020 (JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ELIZABETH E. TOBIN on behalf of Defendants MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. (TOBIN, ELIZABETH)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRYAN T. PRATT on behalf of Defendants MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. (PRATT, BRYAN)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
December 16, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LESLIE C. PACKER on behalf of Defendants MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. (PACKER, LESLIE)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Medtronic plc for MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC... (JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to State Court of Filing Petition for Removal by Defendants MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MEDTRONIC, INC., MEDTRONIC USA, INC., (Original documents filed in Alamance County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS2389, issued 11/8/2019 and listed as Exhibits B and C to the Petition for Removal) (Attachments: #1 Summons - Medtronic USA, Inc.) (Sheets, Jamie)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against MEDTRONIC, INC., MEDTRONIC USA, INC., filed by JIMMY L. MOODY. (Original document filed in Alamance County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS2389 and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against JIMMY L. MOODY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2714710), filed by MEDTRONIC, INC., MEDTRONIC USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons Medtronic, Inc., #3 Exhibit C - Summons Medtronic USA, Inc.) (JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOODY v. MEDTRONIC, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDTRONIC, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER W. JACKSON
Represented By: LESLIE C. PACKER
Represented By: ELIZABETH E. TOBIN
Represented By: BRYAN T. PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDTRONIC USA, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER W. JACKSON
Represented By: LESLIE C. PACKER
Represented By: ELIZABETH E. TOBIN
Represented By: BRYAN T. PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMMY L. MOODY
Represented By: ROBERT O. JENKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?