SAWYERS v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Plaintiff: KAREN SUE SAWYERS
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. and JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Case Number: 1:2019cv01217
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 ELECTRONIC TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS per MDL Order #6 to District of New Jersey. re: MDL 2738 (Taylor, Abby)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-189) transferred this action to District of New Jersey. (Taylor, Abby)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-189) Re: MDL 2738 transferring this action to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016. Received and filed on 01/02/2020. (Taylor, Abby)
December 16, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.) (Sheets, Jamie)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2714727.)(Related Case # 1:19-cv-993, 1:19-cv-1016, 1:19-cv-1211), filed by KAREN SUE SAWYERS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HURST, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAWYERS v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN SUE SAWYERS
Represented By: JOHN DAVID HURST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?