STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA v. ARLETTA L. WILSON et al
Plaintiff: The Estate of Thornton Wilson by Taylor B. Callicutt, Public Administrator, The State of North Carolina ex rel the Estate of Thornton Wilson by Taylor B. Callicutt, Public Administrator, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA and THE ESTATE OF THORNTON WILSON
Defendant: MARKEL CORPORATION, SureTec Insurance Company, Arletta L. Wilson, ALETTA L. WILSON and BARBARA GORE WASHINGTON, ESQ.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00016
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 02/19/2020, that Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time to File Motion to Remand, (Doc. #12 ), is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Garland, Leah)
February 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, THE ESTATE OF THORNTON WILSON by STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, THE ESTATE OF THORNTON WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DECKER, RACHEL)
February 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TRISHA L. BARFIELD on behalf of Plaintiffs STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, THE ESTATE OF THORNTON WILSON (BARFIELD, TRISHA)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, THE ESTATE OF THORNTON WILSON . (DECKER, RACHEL)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RACHEL SCOTT DECKER on behalf of Plaintiffs STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, THE ESTATE OF THORNTON WILSON (DECKER, RACHEL)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 ECF 30 Day Notice as to Attorney TAYLOR B. CALLICUTT. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 2/14/2020. (Sheets, Jamie)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARKEL CORPORATION. (PRICE, JEFFREY)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent MARKEL CORPORATION for SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY.. (PRICE, JEFFREY)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against ARLETTA L. WILSON by SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Indemnity Agreement, #2 Exhibit Bond)(PRICE, JEFFREY)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(Hicks, Samantha)
January 8, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Hicks, Samantha)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 19CVS10451, and is listed as Exhibit A to the #1 Petition for Removal. (Hicks, Samantha)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, THE ESTATE OF THORNTON WILSON. Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 19CVS10451, and is listed as Exhibit A to the #1 Petition for Removal. (Hicks, Samantha)
January 7, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Hicks, Samantha)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, THE ESTATE OF THORNTON WILSON (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2726786), filed by MARKEL CORPORATION, SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings)(PRICE, JEFFREY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA v. ARLETTA L. WILSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Thornton Wilson by Taylor B. Callicutt, Public Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of North Carolina ex rel the Estate of Thornton Wilson by Taylor B. Callicutt, Public Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: TRISHA L. BARFIELD
Represented By: RACHEL SCOTT DECKER
Represented By: TAYLOR B. CALLICUTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF THORNTON WILSON
Represented By: TRISHA L. BARFIELD
Represented By: RACHEL SCOTT DECKER
Represented By: TAYLOR B. CALLICUTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARKEL CORPORATION
Represented By: JEFFREY S. PRICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SureTec Insurance Company
Represented By: JEFFREY S. PRICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arletta L. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALETTA L. WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA GORE WASHINGTON, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?