SMITH v. BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Plaintiff: EDWARD SMITH
Defendant: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00060
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (WICKER, JACKSON)
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. Response to Motion due by 4/1/2020 (WICKER, JACKSON)
March 10, 2020 Motion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (Engle, Anita)
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC re #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (MIZE, LESLIE)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Email chain, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MIZE, LESLIE)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent BMC (US) Holding Corp. for BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC.. (MIZE, LESLIE)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LESLIE LANE MIZE on behalf of Defendant BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC (MIZE, LESLIE)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JACKSON D. WICKER on behalf of Defendant BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC (WICKER, JACKSON)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney VLAD HIRNYK on behalf of Plaintiff EDWARD SMITH (HIRNYK, VLAD)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (SERBIN, LAWRENCE)
January 21, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (Sheets, Jamie)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2734034), filed by EDWARD SMITH. (SERBIN, LAWRENCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD SMITH
Represented By: LAWRENCE B. SERBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?