COOK v. WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER et al
Plaintiff: TONYA COOK
Defendant: WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY HEALTH SCIENCES and WAKE FOREST BAPTIST HEALTH-WILKES MEDICAL CENTER
Case Number: 1:2020cv00193
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by TONYA COOK as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Summons re WFBH-Wilkes, #2 Exhibit Waiver of Summons re WF Health Sciences) (WINIKOFF, BENJAMIN) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/7/2020 with correct image) (Sheets, Jamie)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
February 28, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY HEALTH SCIENCES, WAKE FOREST BAPTIST HEALTH-WILKES MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Wake Forest University Health Sciences, #2 Summons - Wake Forest Baptist Health-Wilkes Medical Center) (Sheets, Jamie)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2761315.), filed by TONYA COOK.(WINIKOFF, BENJAMIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOK v. WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY HEALTH SCIENCES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAKE FOREST BAPTIST HEALTH-WILKES MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONYA COOK
Represented By: BENJAMIN P. WINIKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?