REPUBLIC FRANKLIN INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Plaintiff: UTICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, REPUBLIC FRANKLIN INSURANCE COMPANY and GRAPHIC ARTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: CHERYL CARNAHAN, ALICIA WOODS, ELIZABETH CLARY, RONNIE JACKSON, NANCY KUEFFER and CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv00448
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
2 Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
3 Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by CHERYL CARNAHAN; ELIZABETH CLARY; RONNIE JACKSON; NANCY KUEFFER. Answer due by 8/5/2020. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on July 1, 2020 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court.(Powell, Gloria)
July 1, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by CHERYL CARNAHAN, ELIZABETH CLARY, RONNIE JACKSON, NANCY KUEFFER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HALL, JONATHAN)
June 29, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION. (COATS, DAVID)
June 15, 2020 Filing 16 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by counsel on behalf of Nancy Kueffer, Cheryl Carnahan, Elizabeth Clary, Ronnie Jackson on 06/15/2020. (HALL, JONATHAN)
June 15, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JONATHAN E. HALL on behalf of Defendants CHERYL CARNAHAN, ELIZABETH CLARY, RONNIE JACKSON, NANCY KUEFFER (HALL, JONATHAN)
June 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID S. COATS on behalf of Defendant CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION (COATS, DAVID)
June 9, 2020 Filing 13 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by counsel (WISZ, DAVID)
June 9, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION (WISZ, DAVID)
June 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID S. WISZ on behalf of Defendant CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION (WISZ, DAVID)
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by ALICIA WOODS. (JESSUP, ROBERT)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT HENRY JESSUP, IV on behalf of Defendant ALICIA WOODS (JESSUP, ROBERT)
May 21, 2020 Case Reassigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES, MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER no longer assigned to the case. (Marsh, Keah)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
May 20, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
May 20, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Chapel Hill - Carrboro City Schools 2, #2 Summons - Nancy Kueffer, #3 Summons - Cheryl Carnahan, #4 Summons - Cheryl Carnahan 2, #5 Summons - Elizabeth Clary, #6 Summons - Ronnie Jackson, #7 Summons - Alicia Woods) (Sheets, Jamie)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UTICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (VANORE, ANDREW)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GRAPHIC ARTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (VANORE, ANDREW)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by REPUBLIC FRANKLIN INSURANCE COMPANY. (VANORE, ANDREW)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANDREW ALBERT VANORE, III on behalf of Plaintiffs GRAPHIC ARTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, REPUBLIC FRANKLIN INSURANCE COMPANY, UTICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (VANORE, ANDREW)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2809382.), filed by REPUBLIC FRANKLIN INSURANCE COMPANY, UTICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GRAPHIC ARTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. Index to Exhibits, #3 Exhibit B. Complaint-Middle District-1:19-CV-01018, #4 Exhibit C. Republic Franklin Insurance Company Policy - CPP 3606171 - 07/01/2009-07/01-2010, #5 Exhibit D. Republic Franklin Insurance Company Policy - CPP 3606171 - 07/01/2010 - 07/01/2011, #6 Exhibit E. Graphic Arts Mutual Insurance Company Policy - BAC 3606172 - 07/01/2009-07/01/2010, #7 Exhibit F. Graphic Arts Mutual Insurance Company Policy - BAC 3606172 - 07/01/2010-07/01/2011, #8 Exhibit G. Utica Mutual Insurance Company Policy - CULP 3606174 - 07/01/2009-07/01-2010, #9 Exhibit H. Utica Mutual Insurance Company Policy CULP 3606174 - 07/01/2010-07/01/2011) (VANORE, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REPUBLIC FRANKLIN INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL CARNAHAN
Represented By: JONATHAN E. HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALICIA WOODS
Represented By: ROBERT HENRY JESSUP, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH CLARY
Represented By: JONATHAN E. HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONNIE JACKSON
Represented By: JONATHAN E. HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY KUEFFER
Represented By: JONATHAN E. HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: DAVID S. WISZ
Represented By: DAVID S. COATS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UTICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ANDREW ALBERT VANORE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REPUBLIC FRANKLIN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ANDREW ALBERT VANORE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRAPHIC ARTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ANDREW ALBERT VANORE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?