CONNECTIONS EDUCATION LLC v. NORTH CAROLINA FOR QUALITY VIRTUAL EDUCATION, INC.
Plaintiff: Connections Education LLC
Defendant: North Carolina For Quality Virtual Education, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00484
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , Counterclaim against by NORTH CAROLINA FOR QUALITY VIRTUAL EDUCATION, INC.. (RASCOE, DONNA)
July 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ZACHARY S. ANSTETT on behalf of Defendant NORTH CAROLINA FOR QUALITY VIRTUAL EDUCATION, INC. (ANSTETT, ZACHARY)
July 17, 2020 Case Reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR no longer assigned to the case. (Marsh, Keah)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Plaintiff CONNECTIONS EDUCATION LLC . (BROWN, ANDREW)
June 30, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by 07/29/2020. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 06/30/2020. (AULD, L.)
June 30, 2020 Motions Referred: RE: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Winchester, Robin)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by NORTH CAROLINA FOR QUALITY VIRTUAL EDUCATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RASCOE, DONNA)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant NORTH CAROLINA FOR QUALITY VIRTUAL EDUCATION, INC. (RASCOE, DONNA)
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DONNA R. RASCOE on behalf of Defendant NORTH CAROLINA FOR QUALITY VIRTUAL EDUCATION, INC. (RASCOE, DONNA)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to NORTH CAROLINA FOR QUALITY VIRTUAL EDUCATION, INC. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by CONNECTIONS EDUCATION LLC SUMMONS (BROWN, ANDREW)
June 2, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to NORTH CAROLINA FOR QUALITY VIRTUAL EDUCATION, INC. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN E. BRANCH, III on behalf of Plaintiff CONNECTIONS EDUCATION LLC (BRANCH, JOHN)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONNECTIONS EDUCATION LLC identifying Corporate Parent CONNECTIONS EDUCATION, INC., PEARSON EDUCATION, INC., PEARSON OVERSEAS HOLDINGS LIMITED, PEARSON PLC, for CONNECTIONS EDUCATION LLC. (BROWN, ANDREW) Modified on 6/2/2020 to add all corporate party names. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANDREW D. BROWN on behalf of Plaintiff Connections Education LLC (BROWN, ANDREW) Modified on 6/2/2020 to mark filed in error - attorney to re-file using correct e-filer login and password. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANDREW D. BROWN on behalf of Plaintiff CONNECTIONS EDUCATION LLC (BROWN, ANDREW)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT TO ENFORCE MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT against NORTH CAROLINA FOR QUALITY VIRTUAL EDUCATION, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2815756), filed by CONNECTIONS EDUCATION LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ltr to Cranfill 7.8.19, #3 Exhibit Ltr to Rascoe 8.1.19, #4 Exhibit NCAA Asset Invoice, #5 Exhibit Rent Invoice, #6 Exhibit Ltr to Rascoe 8.30.19, #7 Exhibit Ltr to Rascoe 1010.19, #8 Exhibit Summons, #9 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet) (BROWN, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONNECTIONS EDUCATION LLC v. NORTH CAROLINA FOR QUALITY VIRTUAL EDUCATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connections Education LLC
Represented By: ANDREW D. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina For Quality Virtual Education, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?