MCCUTCHEN v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: SHAQUANA MCCUTCHEN
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED and COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Case Number: 1:2020cv00497
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
2 Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Case Reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. UNASSIGNED, MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE no longer assigned to the case. (Marsh, Keah)
July 21, 2020 Case no longer designated to Standing Order 30. (Marsh, Keah)
June 22, 2020 ELECTRONIC TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS to Southern District of Indiana. (Taylor, Abby)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts and and counsel of record Re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-89) transferring this action to Southern District of Indiana. (Taylor, Abby)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-89) Re: MDL 2570 transferring this action to the Southern District of Indiana for the reasons stated in the order of October 15, 2014, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard L. Young. Received and filed on 06/17/2020. (Taylor, Abby)
June 5, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 5, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 5, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Cook Medical LLC, #2 Summons - Cook Group Incorporated) (Sheets, Jamie)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2818556), filed by SHAQUANA MCCUTCHEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BUTCHER, WHITNEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCUTCHEN v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAQUANA MCCUTCHEN
Represented By: WHITNEY J. BUTCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?