WESTER v. WELL CARE HOME HEALTH OF THE TRIANGLE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BONITA WESTER
Defendant: WELL CARE HOME HEALTH, INC. and WELL CARE HOME HEALTH OF THE TRIANGLE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00502
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 9/28/2020 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WELL CARE HOME HEALTH, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Well Care Health, LLC for WELL CARE HOME HEALTH, INC... (SCHENK, EDWARD)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WELL CARE HOME HEALTH OF THE TRIANGLE, INC. identifying Corporate Parent WELL CARE HOME HEALTH, INC., Corporate Parent Well Care Health, LLC for WELL CARE HOME HEALTH OF THE TRIANGLE, INC... (SCHENK, EDWARD)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by WELL CARE HOME HEALTH OF THE TRIANGLE, INC., WELL CARE HOME HEALTH, INC.. (SCHENK, EDWARD)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by WELL CARE HOME HEALTH OF THE TRIANGLE, INC.; WELL CARE HOME HEALTH, INC. Answer due by 7/30/2020. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on July 2, 2020 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Powell, Gloria)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by WELL CARE HOME HEALTH OF THE TRIANGLE, INC., WELL CARE HOME HEALTH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(SCHENK, EDWARD)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney EDWARD S. SCHENK, III on behalf of Defendants WELL CARE HOME HEALTH OF THE TRIANGLE, INC., WELL CARE HOME HEALTH, INC. (SCHENK, EDWARD)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ASA C. EDWARDS, IV on behalf of Plaintiff BONITA WESTER (EDWARDS, ASA)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to WELL CARE HOME HEALTH OF THE TRIANGLE, INC. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 5, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to WELL CARE HOME HEALTH OF THE TRIANGLE, INC., WELL CARE HOME HEALTH, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Well Care Home Health, Inc.) (Sheets, Jamie)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2818903), filed by BONITA WESTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (DAVIS, GARRETT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESTER v. WELL CARE HOME HEALTH OF THE TRIANGLE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELL CARE HOME HEALTH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELL CARE HOME HEALTH OF THE TRIANGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONITA WESTER
Represented By: GARRETT L. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?