CALI FRESH, LLC v. THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. . et al
Plaintiff: Cali Fresh, LLC
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Co. and The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00522
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JASON W. BURGESS on behalf of Defendants THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE CO. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2855980.) (BURGESS, JASON)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. and TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE CO. Answer due by 8/25/2020. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 07/31/2020. (Brubaker, John)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(WATSON, LEWIS)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE CO. (WATSON, LEWIS)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. (WATSON, LEWIS)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LEWIS ANDREW WATSON on behalf of Defendants THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE CO. (WATSON, LEWIS)
June 12, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 12, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE CO. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Twin City Fire Insurance Co.) (Sheets, Jamie)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PATRICK M. WALLACE on behalf of Plaintiff CALI FRESH, LLC (WALLACE, PATRICK)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DANIEL KENT BRYSON on behalf of Plaintiff CALI FRESH, LLC (BRYSON, DANIEL)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SCOTT C. HARRIS on behalf of Plaintiff CALI FRESH, LLC (HARRIS, SCOTT)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE CO. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2822313), filed by CALI FRESH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Hartford Ins. Policy, #3 Exhibit B - Cali Fresh Denial Letter) (HARRIS, SCOTT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CALI FRESH, LLC v. THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. . et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cali Fresh, LLC
Represented By: SCOTT C. HARRIS
Represented By: PATRICK M. WALLACE
Represented By: DANIEL KENT BRYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?