HILL v. C. R. BARD, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BEVERLY T HILL and BEVERLY T. HILL
Defendant: BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. and C. R. BARD, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00626
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 9/28/2020 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC.. (OSOWSKI, PAUL)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. identifying Corporate Parent C. R. BARD, INC., Corporate Parent BECTON, DICKINSON AND COMPANY for BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC... (OSOWSKI, PAUL)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C. R. BARD, INC. identifying Corporate Parent BECTON, DICKINSON AND COMPANY for C. R. BARD, INC... (OSOWSKI, PAUL)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PAUL J. OSOWSKI on behalf of Defendants BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC. (OSOWSKI, PAUL)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendants BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC. (STARR, WILLIAM)
July 9, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 9, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to C. R. BARD, INC., BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - BARD Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Sheets, Jamie)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2839964.), filed by BEVERLY T HILL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MARTIN, BEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL v. C. R. BARD, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.
Represented By: PAUL J. OSOWSKI
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. BARD, INC.
Represented By: PAUL J. OSOWSKI
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLY T HILL
Represented By: BEN C. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLY T. HILL
Represented By: BEN C. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?