LINDEMANN-MOSES v. JACKMON et al
Plaintiff: KERSTIN LINDEMANN-MOSES
Defendant: BARBARA JACKMON and CHRISTOPHER ANDRE JACKMON
Case Number: 1:2020cv00655
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION by Plaintiff KERSTIN LINDEMANN-MOSES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Daniel, J)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in Opposition by Plaintiff KERSTIN LINDEMANN-MOSES re: #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Daniel, J)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by KERSTIN LINDEMANN-MOSES re: #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Replies due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Daniel, J)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond to (Doc. #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Daniel, J)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS by BARBARA JACKMON FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Response due by 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Daniel, J)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Plaintiff shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BARBARA JACKMON. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BARBARA JACKMON, CHRISTOPHER ANDRE JACKMON, filed by KERSTIN LINDEMANN-MOSES. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (Sheets, Jamie)
July 15, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 15, 2020 Receipt of Funds for filing fee in the amount of $ 400.00. Receipt Number NCM051069. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LINDEMANN-MOSES v. JACKMON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERSTIN LINDEMANN-MOSES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA JACKMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER ANDRE JACKMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?