MATTHEWS et al v. MONSANTO COMPANY
Plaintiff: RICKY LEE MATTHEWS and NANCY MATTHEWS
Defendant: MONSANTO COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv00669
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order transferring this action to the Northern District of California. (Hicks, Samantha)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER(CTO-227) re: MDL 2741 transferring this action to the Northern District of California for reasons stated in the order of August 12, 2020. Received and filed on 8/13/2020. (Hicks, Samantha)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s) (GUEST, CARRIE)
July 23, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 23, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nancy Matthews. (GUEST, CARRIE)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ricky Lee Matthews. (GUEST, CARRIE)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney HENRY FOREST HORNE, JR on behalf of Plaintiffs Nancy Matthews, Ricky Lee Matthews (HORNE, HENRY)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CARRIE R. GUEST on behalf of Plaintiffs Nancy Matthews, Ricky Lee Matthews (GUEST, CARRIE)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2848282.), filed by Ricky Lee Matthews, Nancy Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(GUEST, CARRIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATTHEWS et al v. MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY LEE MATTHEWS
Represented By: HENRY FOREST HORNE, JR.
Represented By: CARRIE R. GUEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY MATTHEWS
Represented By: HENRY FOREST HORNE, JR.
Represented By: CARRIE R. GUEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?