Echerd v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Plaintiff: Tomme Echerd
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., Janssen Ortho, LLC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON and TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00718
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 22 BRIEF re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(HOHNBAUM, CORY)
October 2, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Response to Motion due by 10/23/2020 (HOHNBAUM, CORY)
September 25, 2020 Filing 20 BRIEF re #19 MOTION to Stay of All Proceedings Pending a Decision on MDL Centralization . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HOHNBAUM, CORY)
September 25, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay of All Proceedings Pending a Decision on MDL Centralization by JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/16/2020 (HOHNBAUM, CORY)
September 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC and JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, filed by Plaintiff TOMME ECHERD (GEER, MARTHA)
September 3, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Teva Memo - USPTO Search Results)(COBB, BARRY)
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Response to Motion due by 9/24/2020 (COBB, BARRY)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. identifying Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC... (COBB, BARRY)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. identifying Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC... (COBB, BARRY)
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney BARRY S. COBB on behalf of Defendants TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (COBB, BARRY)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney SAMUEL G. THOMPSON, JR on behalf of Defendants TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (THOMPSON, SAMUEL)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC; JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.; JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC; JOHNSON & JOHNSON; and ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, LLC. Answer due by 10/3/2020. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 09/02/2020. (Brubaker, John)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, LLC. (HOHNBAUM, CORY)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOMME ECHERD as to JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (GEER, MARTHA)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOMME ECHERD as to JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (GEER, MARTHA)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOMME ECHERD as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (GEER, MARTHA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOMME ECHERD as to TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (GEER, MARTHA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOMME ECHERD as to TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (GEER, MARTHA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOMME ECHERD as to ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, LLC served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (GEER, MARTHA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOMME ECHERD as to JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (GEER, MARTHA)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #2 Summons - Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC, #3 Summons - Janssen Research & Development, LLC, #4 Summons - Janssen Ortho, LLC, #5 Summons - Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD&, #6 Summons - Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #7 Summons - Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.) (Sheets, Jamie)
August 10, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 10, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2859231), filed by TOMME ECHERD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (GEER, MARTHA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Echerd v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: CORY HOHNBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: SAMUEL G. THOMPSON, JR.
Represented By: BARRY S. COBB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho, LLC
Represented By: CORY HOHNBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Represented By: CORY HOHNBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Represented By: SAMUEL G. THOMPSON, JR.
Represented By: BARRY S. COBB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC
Represented By: CORY HOHNBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: CORY HOHNBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
Represented By: SAMUEL G. THOMPSON, JR.
Represented By: BARRY S. COBB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomme Echerd
Represented By: MARTHA A. GEER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?