CADET CONSTRUCTION COMPANY v. ARCHER WESTERN CONSTRUCTION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CADET CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Defendant: ARCHER WESTERN CONSTRUCTION, LLC and TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00737
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (ATKINS, ANDREW)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaim for CADET CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. Answer due by 11/9/2020. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/8/2020. (Brubaker, John)
October 8, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by CADET CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CARSON, B.) Modified on 10/8/2020 to correct docket event. (Brubaker, John).
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , Counterclaim against by ARCHER WESTERN CONSTRUCTION, LLC. (ATKINS, ANDREW)
August 25, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA shall answer or otherwise respond by 10/13/2020. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 08/25/2020. (AULD, L.)
August 25, 2020 Motions Referred: RE: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Sanders, Marlene)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by ARCHER WESTERN CONSTRUCTION, LLC. Answer due by 9/28/2020. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 8/24/2020 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Powell, Gloria)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney PETER J. MARINO on behalf of Defendants ARCHER WESTERN CONSTRUCTION, LLC, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA (MARINO, PETER)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (ATKINS, ANDREW)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by ARCHER WESTERN CONSTRUCTION, LLC. (ATKINS, ANDREW)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY CORP., Corporate Parent TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY for TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA.. (ATKINS, ANDREW)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARCHER WESTERN CONSTRUCTION, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Walsh Construction Group, LLC for ARCHER WESTERN CONSTRUCTION, LLC.. (ATKINS, ANDREW)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ANDREW PERRY ATKINS on behalf of Defendants ARCHER WESTERN CONSTRUCTION, LLC, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA (ATKINS, ANDREW)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to All Defendants. Answer due 09/08/2020. (KING, MARY)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney B. DAVID CARSON on behalf of Plaintiff CADET CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (CARSON, B.)
August 13, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ARCHER WESTERN CONSTRUCTION, LLC, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America) (Sheets, Jamie)
August 13, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CADET CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. (KING, MARY)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MARY F. SHERRILL KING on behalf of Plaintiff CADET CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (KING, MARY)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2862662), filed by CADET CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (KING, MARY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CADET CONSTRUCTION COMPANY v. ARCHER WESTERN CONSTRUCTION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CADET CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: MARY F. SHERRILL KING
Represented By: MARY FLETCHER K. MULLIKIN
Represented By: B. DAVID CARSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCHER WESTERN CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Represented By: PETER J. MARINO
Represented By: ANDREW PERRY ATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: PETER J. MARINO
Represented By: ANDREW PERRY ATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?