WALKER v. PETSENSE LLC et al
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE A. WALKER
Defendant: PETSENSE LLC and TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv00738
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Motion Submitted: #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 09/23/2020, that the Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. #12 is GRANTED, and the Response filed on September 9, 2020 is deemed timely filed.(Taylor, Abby)
September 23, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY, filed by Defendants PETSENSE LLC, TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY, to Response to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PETSENSE LLC, TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY. (LAWLER, PATRICK)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM entitled "Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss" re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by Plaintiff STEPHANIE A. WALKER. (Garland, Leah)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by STEPHANIE A. WALKER. Replies due by 9/23/2020. (Garland, Leah)
September 1, 2020 Motion Referred: RE: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Blay, Debbie)
September 1, 2020 Email to/from Attorney Kevin Joyner on 9/1/2020. He advised the Clerk's Office that the Defendant has no objection to #12 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. (Blay, Debbie)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by STEPHANIE A. WALKER. (Garland, Leah)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 Roseboro Letter. Re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PETSENSE LLC, TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY (Taylor, Abby)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants PETSENSE LLC, TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PETSENSE LLC, TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY. (LAWLER, PATRICK)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PETSENSE LLC, TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY. Response to Motion due by 9/14/2020 (LAWLER, PATRICK)
August 13, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to PETSENSE LLC, TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY. (Original document filed in Lee County Superior Court, case number 20-CV-536, issued 7/9/2020 and listed as Attachment 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant PETSENSE LLC, TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY, filed by STEPHANIE A. WALKER. (Original document filed in Lee County Superior Court, case number 20-CV-536, and listed as Attachment 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against PETSENSE LLC, TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY, filed by STEPHANIE A. WALKER. (Original document filed in Lee County Superior Court, case number 20-CV-536, and listed as Attachment 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KEVIN SCOTT JOYNER on behalf of Defendants Petsense LLC, TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY (JOYNER, KEVIN)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Petsense LLC, TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY. (LAWLER, PATRICK)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney PATRICK D. LAWLER on behalf of Defendants Petsense LLC, TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY (LAWLER, PATRICK)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against Stephanie A Walker ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2862706.), filed by TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY, Petsense LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal)(LAWLER, PATRICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALKER v. PETSENSE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE A. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETSENSE LLC
Represented By: KEVIN SCOTT JOYNER
Represented By: PATRICK D. LAWLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY
Represented By: KEVIN SCOTT JOYNER
Represented By: PATRICK D. LAWLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?