WATSON v. BROCK & SCOTT PLLC
Plaintiff: Kelly Watson and KELLY S. WATSON
Defendant: Brock & Scott PLLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00751
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for BROCK & SCOTT PLLC. Answer due by 11/5/2020. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/5/2020. (Brubaker, John)
October 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BROCK & SCOTT PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PRESEL, ALAN)
October 3, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant BROCK & SCOTT PLLC (PRESEL, ALAN)
October 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ALAN M. PRESEL on behalf of Defendant BROCK & SCOTT PLLC (PRESEL, ALAN)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WESLEY S. WHITE on behalf of Plaintiff KELLY S. WATSON (WHITE, WESLEY)
August 19, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BROCK & SCOTT PLLC. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BROCK & SCOTT PLLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2866127), filed by KELLY S. WATSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Payoff Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (KRUZYK, ALEXANDER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WATSON v. BROCK & SCOTT PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Watson
Represented By: ALEXANDER D. KRUZYK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY S. WATSON
Represented By: ALEXANDER D. KRUZYK
Represented By: WESLEY S. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock & Scott PLLC
Represented By: ALAN M. PRESEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?