CARR v. C. R. BARD, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CLYDE CARR
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION, C. R. BARD, INC., DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE and BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00752
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 34 STIPULATION of Dismissal of McKesson Corporation Without Prejudice by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION. (STARR, WILLIAM)
September 22, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney PAUL J. OSOWSKI on behalf of Defendants BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION (OSOWSKI, PAUL)
September 22, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendants BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION. WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR is substituted as counsel for Defendants. Attorney JORDAN E JARREAU and MELISSA DORMAN MATTHEWS terminated. (STARR, WILLIAM)
September 22, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney STEVEN S. SCHULTE on behalf of Plaintiff CLYDE CARR ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2897297.) (SCHULTE, STEVEN)
September 21, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Plaintiff CLYDE CARR. STEVEN S. SCHULTE is substituted as counsel for Plaintiff. Attorney DARREN MCDOWELL and ERIC MARTIN PRZYBYSZ terminated. (SCHULTE, STEVEN)
September 21, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney STEVEN S. SCHULTE on behalf of Plaintiff CLYDE CARR ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2896972.) (SCHULTE, STEVEN)
September 10, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney AUDREY M. SNYDER on behalf of Plaintiff CLYDE CARR (SNYDER, AUDREY)
September 10, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JANET WARD BLACK on behalf of Plaintiff CLYDE CARR (BLACK, JANET WARD)
August 19, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 26 ECF 30 Day Notice as to Attorney ERIC MARTIN PRZYBYSZ. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 30 DAY ECF NOTICE - DARREN MCDOWELL, #2 30 DAY ECF NOTICE - STEVEN SCOTT SCHULTE, #3 30 DAY ECF NOTICE - MELISSA DORMAN MATTHEWS, #4 30 DAY ECF NOTICE - JORDAN E JARREAU)(Hicks, Samantha) Modified on 8/19/2020 to show that ERIC MARTIN PRZYBYSZ is a registered CM/ECF user. Disregard letter. (Hicks, Samantha)
August 19, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02293. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Memorandum Opinion and Order re: #21 Unopposed Amended Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court GRANTS the Motion and directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Clyde Carr's case be severed and transferred to the Durham Division of the Middle District of North Carolina (Civil case 3:20-cv-2293-S opened); b. Plaintiff Rebecca Copperthtie's case be severed and transferred to the Richmond Division of the Eastern District of Virginia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2294-S opened); c. Plaintiff George Fenwick's case be severed and transferred to the Fargo Division of the District of North Dakota (Civil case 3:20-cv-2295-S opened); d. Plaintiff Bettye Floyd's case be severed and transferred to the Southern Division of the Northern District of Alabama (Civil case 3:20-cv-2296-S opened); e. Plaintiff Carolyn Lowe's case be severed and transferred to the Jackson Division of the Western District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2297-S opened); f. Plaintiff Janet Nacham's case be severed and transferred to the Erie Division of the Western District of Pennsylvania (Civil case 3:20-cv-2298-S opened); g. Plaintiff Jason Newcomb's case be severed and transferred to the Lynchburg Division of the Western District of Virginia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2299-S opened); h. Plaintiff Alethea Thomas's case be severed and transferred to the Memphis Division of the Western District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2300-S opened); i. Plaintiff Lela Tunstall's case be severed and transferred to the Mobile Division of the Southern District of Alabama (Civil case 3:20-cv-2301-S opened). Plaintiff Jane Stewart is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/18/2020) (ykp) Modified on 8/18/2020 (axm). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #21 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #18 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 22 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Clyde Carr, Rebecca Copperthtie, George Fenwick, Bettye Floyd, Carolyn Lowe, Janet Nachman, Jason Newcomb, Jane Stewart, Alethea Thomas, Lela Tunstall re #21 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 21 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Clyde Carr, Rebecca Copperthtie, George Fenwick, Bettye Floyd, Carolyn Lowe, Janet Nachman, Jason Newcomb, Jane Stewart, Alethea Thomas, Lela Tunstall (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 20 Appendix in Support filed by Clyde Carr, Rebecca Copperthtie, George Fenwick, Bettye Floyd, Carolyn Lowe, Janet Nachman, Jason Newcomb, Jane Stewart, Alethea Thomas, Lela Tunstall re #18 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Clyde Carr, Rebecca Copperthtie, George Fenwick, Bettye Floyd, Carolyn Lowe, Janet Nachman, Jason Newcomb, Jane Stewart, Alethea Thomas, Lela Tunstall re #18 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Clyde Carr, Rebecca Copperthtie, George Fenwick, Bettye Floyd, Carolyn Lowe, Janet Nachman, Jason Newcomb, Jane Stewart, Alethea Thomas, Lela Tunstall (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by Clyde Carr, Rebecca Copperthtie, George Fenwick, Bettye Floyd, Carolyn Lowe, Janet Nachman, Jason Newcomb, Jane Stewart, Alethea Thomas, Lela Tunstall re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Clyde Carr, Rebecca Copperthtie, George Fenwick, Bettye Floyd, Carolyn Lowe, Janet Nachman, Jason Newcomb, Jane Stewart, Alethea Thomas, Lela Tunstall (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Completed Plaintiff Forms) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION to Extend Time Extension to time resp/reply filed by Clyde Carr, Rebecca Copperthtie, George Fenwick, Bettye Floyd, Carolyn Lowe, Janet Nachman, Jason Newcomb, Jane Stewart, Alethea Thomas, Lela Tunstall (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Przybysz, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 12 replaced with flattened document on 6/18/2020) (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Becton, Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) Modified corporate parent on 6/12/2020 (mla). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Judge Ed Kinkeade no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/10/2020) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10904112) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corp, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARR v. C. R. BARD, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: MELISSA DORMAN MATTHEWS
Represented By: JORDAN E JARREAU
Represented By: PAUL J. OSOWSKI
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. BARD, INC.
Represented By: MELISSA DORMAN MATTHEWS
Represented By: JORDAN E JARREAU
Represented By: PAUL J. OSOWSKI
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.
Represented By: MELISSA DORMAN MATTHEWS
Represented By: JORDAN E JARREAU
Represented By: PAUL J. OSOWSKI
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLYDE CARR
Represented By: DARREN MCDOWELL
Represented By: ERIC MARTIN PRZYBYSZ
Represented By: STEVEN SCOTT SCHULTE
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: AUDREY M. SNYDER
Represented By: STEVEN S. SCHULTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?