JOINER v. SAPPER
Petitioner: RAYMOND DAKIM HARRIS JOINER
Respondent: J. SAPPER
Case Number: 1:2020cv00754
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: N C TILLEY
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGMENT signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. on 9/15/2020. For the reasons set forth in the Order filed contemporaneously with this Judgment, the Petition (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed and this action is dismissed. Finding neither a substantial issue for appeal concerning the denial of a constitutional right affecting the conviction nor a debatable procedural ruling, a certificate of appealability is denied. (Daniel, J)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. on 9/15/2020. The Court adopts the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation and the Petition (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed. A Judgment dismissing this action will be entered contemporaneously with this Order. Finding neither a substantial issue for appeal concerning the denial of a constitutional right affecting the conviction nor a debatable procedural ruling, a certificate of appealability is denied. (Daniel, J)
September 11, 2020 CASE REFERRED regarding #2 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. (Winchester, Robin)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of OBJECTION by Petitioner RAYMOND DAKIM HARRIS JOINER re: #2 MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER AND RECOMMENDATAION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Daniel, J)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Mailing Recommendation: Objections to R&R due by 9/14/2020. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 9/17/2020. (Garland, Leah)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 8/31/2020, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. (Garland, Leah)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER AND RECOMMENDATAION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 8/31/2020, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. RECOMMENDED that the Petition (Docket Entry #1 ) be dismissed. There being no substantial issue for appeal concerning the denial of a constitutional right affecting the conviction nor a debatable procedural ruling, a certificate of appealability should not issue. (Garland, Leah)
August 19, 2020 CASE REFERRED for Screening (Taylor, Abby)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by RAYMOND DAKIM HARRIS JOINER. (Attachments: #1 Additional attachments, #2 Additional attachments, #3 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOINER v. SAPPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. SAPPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RAYMOND DAKIM HARRIS JOINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?