KERR v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: COREY DEWAYNE KERR
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00756
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: N C TILLEY
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Mailing Recommendation: Objections to R&R due by 10/29/2020. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 11/2/2020. (Garland, Leah)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 10/15/2020, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. (Garland, Leah)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 10/15/2020, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. THEREFORE RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Petitioner filing in the proper district after exhausting any available administrative remedies. (Garland, Leah)
August 20, 2020 CASE REFERRED for Screening. (Garland, Leah)
August 20, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garland, Leah)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by COREY DEWAYNE KERR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KERR v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COREY DEWAYNE KERR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?