GALEAS-MENCHU-EL v. TRUMP et al
Plaintiff: JORGE GALEAS-MENCHU-EL, JR.
Defendant: LISA Y. JOHNSON-TONKINS, STEVEN TURNER MNUCHIN and DONALD J. TRUMP
Case Number: 1:2020cv00761
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 OBJECTION TO RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #3 Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge, filed by Plaintiff JORGE GALEAS-MENCHU-EL, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Garland, Leah)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE filed by JORGE GALEAS-MENCHU-EL, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Garland, Leah)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by JORGE GALEAS-MENCHU-EL, JR re: Not Waiving Rights. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Sheets, Jamie)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 9/28/2020. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 10/1/2020. (Hicks, Samantha)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 9/14/2020; that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering #2 Order and Recommendation. (Hicks, Samantha)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 9/14/2020; ORDERED that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. The Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff 1983 forms, instructions, an application to proceed in forma pauperis, and a copy of pertinent parts of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 (i.e., Sections (a) & (d)). RECOMMENDED that this action be filed and dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper 1983 forms, which corrects the defects cited above. (Hicks, Samantha)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff JORGE GALEAS-MENCHU-EL, JR. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Continued, #2 Envelope - Front and Back) (Hicks, Samantha)
August 21, 2020 CASE REFERRED for Screening. (Hicks, Samantha)
August 21, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Hicks, Samantha)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JORGE GALEAS-MENCHU-EL, JR. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Attachments Continued, #3 Attachments Continued, #4 Envelope - Front and Back)(Hicks, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GALEAS-MENCHU-EL v. TRUMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA Y. JOHNSON-TONKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN TURNER MNUCHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE GALEAS-MENCHU-EL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?