LITTLE v. CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Little
Defendant: ELIZABETH CLARY, RONNIE JACKSON, NANCY KUEFFER, CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION and CHERYL CARNAHAN
Case Number: 1:2020cv00796
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION. CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION waiver sent on 9/1/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (HARTZOG, KATIE)
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION. (HARTZOG, KATIE)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MICHAEL B. COHEN on behalf of Defendant CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION (COHEN, MICHAEL)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KATIE WEAVER HARTZOG on behalf of Defendant CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION (HARTZOG, KATIE)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 9/4/2020, that Jamie Little be appointed Guardian ad Litem for the minor, M.B., to appear for him in this action and prosecute it on his behalf. (Garland, Leah)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by NANCY KUEFFER. NANCY KUEFFER waiver sent on 9/1/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (HALL, JONATHAN)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by RONNIE JACKSON. RONNIE JACKSON waiver sent on 9/1/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (HALL, JONATHAN)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by ELIZABETH CLARY. ELIZABETH CLARY waiver sent on 9/1/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (HALL, JONATHAN)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by CHERYL CARNAHAN. CHERYL CARNAHAN waiver sent on 9/1/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (HALL, JONATHAN)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MAUREEN M. ZYGLIS on behalf of Defendants CHERYL CARNAHAN, ELIZABETH CLARY, RONNIE JACKSON, NANCY KUEFFER (ZYGLIS, MAUREEN)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JONATHAN E. HALL on behalf of Defendants CHERYL CARNAHAN, ELIZABETH CLARY, RONNIE JACKSON, NANCY KUEFFER (HALL, JONATHAN)
September 3, 2020 Motion Submitted to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: #2 MOTION to Appoint ad Litem for Minor Child, M.B. (Engle, Anita)
September 2, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Hicks, Samantha)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION, NANCY KUEFFER, CHERYL CARNAHAN, ELIZABETH CLARY, RONNIE JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Nancy Kueffer, #2 Summons - Cheryl Carnahan, #3 Summons - Elizabeth Clary, #4 Summons - Ronnie Jackson) (Sheets, Jamie)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ROBERT HENRY JESSUP, IV on behalf of Plaintiff JAMIE LITTLE. (JESSUP, ROBERT)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney REBECCA H. UGOLICK on behalf of Plaintiff JAMIE LITTLE. (UGOLICK, REBECCA)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint ad Litem for Minor Child, M.B., by JAMIE LITTLE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Guardian ad Litem, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (UGOLICK, REBECCA)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2878465) (Related Case # 1:19-CV-01018-LCB-JEP), filed by JAMIE LITTLE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Affidavit of Talya Mazor, #2 Exhibit B: Affidavit of Lucy Hayes) (UGOLICK, REBECCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LITTLE v. CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Little
Represented By: REBECCA H. UGOLICK
Represented By: ROBERT HENRY JESSUP, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH CLARY
Represented By: JONATHAN E. HALL
Represented By: MAUREEN M. ZYGLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONNIE JACKSON
Represented By: JONATHAN E. HALL
Represented By: MAUREEN M. ZYGLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY KUEFFER
Represented By: JONATHAN E. HALL
Represented By: MAUREEN M. ZYGLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: KATIE WEAVER HARTZOG
Represented By: MICHAEL B. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL CARNAHAN
Represented By: JONATHAN E. HALL
Represented By: MAUREEN M. ZYGLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?