QUALITY TRANSPORTATION OF ROWAN COUNTY, INC. v. THE CITADEL SALISBURY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: QUALITY TRANSPORTATION OF ROWAN COUNTY, INC.
Defendant: ACCORDIUS HEALTH, LLC, THE PORTOPICCOLO GROUP, LLC, ACCORDIUS HEALTH AT SALISBURY, LLC and THE CITADEL SALISBURY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00838
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER ; Mediation due by 1/5/2021. (Gammon, Cheryl)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 10/07/2020, granting #20 RULE 26F (JOINT). The parties agree that the appropriate plan is that designated in LR 26.1(a) as: Standard. Mediation due by 1/5/2021. The parties agree to mediation with Ray Owens as the mediator. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2020. Defendants Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2020. Discovery due by 2/22/2021. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 11/1/2020. Joinder of Parties for Defendants due by 12/1/2020. The parties do not agree to referral to a Magistrate Judge. Trial of the action is expected to take approximately 2 days. A jury trial has been demanded.(Taylor, Abby)
October 7, 2020 Motions Referred: RE: #20 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim)
October 6, 2020 Filing 20 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by QUALITY TRANSPORTATION OF ROWAN COUNTY, INC..(HUGHES, JOHN)
October 1, 2020 TEXT ORDER Terminating as Motion #2 Consent Motion for Joinder By Accordius Health, LLC, The Portopiccolo Group, LLC. Based upon the representations of the parties, the document shall be construed as a consent to removal filed under 28 U.S.C. 1446(b)(2)(A). As such, it will not be treated as a motion. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 10/1/2020.(Lee, Pedra)
September 30, 2020 Filing 19 JOINT STIPULATION CONSENT TO REMOVAL AND CLARIFICATION OF FILING AT DOC. 2 filed by all parties.. (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
September 30, 2020 Motions Referred: RE: #2 Consent MOTION for Joinder to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sanders, Marlene)
September 28, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE re #2 Consent MOTION for Joinder filed by QUALITY TRANSPORTATION OF ROWAN COUNTY, INC.. Replies due by 10/13/2020 (HUGHES, JOHN)
September 28, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QUALITY TRANSPORTATION OF ROWAN COUNTY, INC.. (HUGHES, JOHN)
September 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JOHN S. HUGHES on behalf of Plaintiff QUALITY TRANSPORTATION OF ROWAN COUNTY, INC. (HUGHES, JOHN)
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 10/21/2020 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #7 Complaint by ACCORDIUS HEALTH, LLC. (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #7 Complaint by THE PORTOPICCOLO GROUP, LLC. (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #7 Complaint by ACCORDIUS HEALTH AT SALISBURY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence to Counsel for Plaintiff)(PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #7 Complaint by THE CITADEL SALISBURY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence to Counsel for Plaintiff)(PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Hicks, Samantha)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Original document filed in Rowan County Superior Court, Case # 20 CVS 1293, issued 8/10/2020, and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the #1 Petition for Removal.) (Hicks, Samantha)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by QUALITY TRANSPORTATION OF ROWAN COUNTY, INC. (Original document filed in Rowan County Superior Court, Case # 20 CVS 1293, and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the #1 Petition for Removal.) (Hicks, Samantha)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE PORTOPICCOLO GROUP, LLC. (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CITADEL SALISBURY, LLC. (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Accordius Health, LLC. (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Accordius Health at Salisbury, LLC. (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 Consent MOTION for Joinder by Accordius Health, LLC, THE PORTOPICCOLO GROUP, LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/2/2020 (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against Quality Transportation of Rowan County, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2890727.), filed by Accordius Health, LLC, Accordius Health at Salisbury, LLC, THE CITADEL SALISBURY, LLC, THE PORTOPICCOLO GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit - Citadel Salisbury, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Accordius, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Accordius Health, #5 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of PPG, #6 Exhibit 6 - Pleadings, #7 Exhibit 7 - State Court file)(PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
September 11, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Hicks, Samantha)
September 11, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Hicks, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QUALITY TRANSPORTATION OF ROWAN COUNTY, INC. v. THE CITADEL SALISBURY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCORDIUS HEALTH, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL E. PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PORTOPICCOLO GROUP, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL E. PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCORDIUS HEALTH AT SALISBURY, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL E. PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITADEL SALISBURY, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL E. PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUALITY TRANSPORTATION OF ROWAN COUNTY, INC.
Represented By: MONA LISA WALLACE
Represented By: JOHN S. HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?