JOHNSON v. GUILFORD COUNTY CENTRAL JAIL et al
Plaintiff: KENNETH JOHNSON
Defendant: SERGEANT TAYLOR, GUILFORD COUNTY CENTRAL JAIL, GUILFORD COUNTY CENTRAL JAIL TACTICAL TEAM, SERGEANT BOGGS, GUILFORD COUNTY CENTRAL JAIL OFFICER SMITH and SERGEANT PEARMAN
Case Number: 1:2020cv00889
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 CASE REFERRED RE: #2 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
October 19, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 11/2/2020. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 11/5/2020. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 10/19/2020; that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering #2 Order and Recommendation. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 10/19/2020; ORDERED that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. The Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff 1983 forms, instructions, an application to proceed in forma pauperis, and a copy of pertinent parts of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 (i.e., Sections (a) & (d)). RECOMMENDED that this action be filed and dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper 1983 forms, which corrects the defect cited above. (Hicks, Samantha)
September 30, 2020 CASE REFERRED for Screening. (Hicks, Samantha)
September 30, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Hicks, Samantha)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by KENNETH JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Hicks, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. GUILFORD COUNTY CENTRAL JAIL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUILFORD COUNTY CENTRAL JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUILFORD COUNTY CENTRAL JAIL TACTICAL TEAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT BOGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUILFORD COUNTY CENTRAL JAIL OFFICER SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT PEARMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?