WILLIAMS v. WILLIAMS
Plaintiff: RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS
Defendant: RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv00904
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION by RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS for Partial Summary Judgment. Response due by 12/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Daniel, J)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Appointing ANDERSON D. CROMER, as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Kemp, Donita)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 11/18/2020. Defendant's Amended Individual Rule 26(f) Report (Docket Entry #14 ) is adopted and approved with the following modification: Further amendments to the pleadings will be considered with close scrutiny. Dispositive motions, including motions for summary judgment, shall be filed no later than May 3, 2021. FURTHER that Defendant's original Individual Rule 26(f) Report (Docket Entry #13 ) and Plaintiff's Individual Rule 26(f) Report (Docket Entry #15 ) shall be terminated. FURTHER that upon consent of Defendants, Plaintiff's motions to amend his Complaint (Docket Entries #11 , #12 ) are GRANTED. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file his Second Amended Complaint in its entirety and said document shall serve as the operative Complaint in this action. Defendant shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of the filing of the Second Amended Complaint to file an Answer to the Second Amended Complaint. (Daniel, J)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Mediation due by 4/1/2021.(Kemp, Donita)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Scheduling Order Deadlines. The appropriate case-management track for this case established in L.R. 26.1(a) is standard. Discovery due by 4/1/2021. Dispositive motions due by 5/3/2021. Plaintiff's amended pleadings and joinder of parties due by 12/31/2020. Defendant's amended pleadings and joinder of parties due by 1/30/2021. The parties shall engage is mediation during the discovery period. Retired Superior Court Judge Anderson Cromer shall serve as mediator. The Defendant does not consent to trial jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. ETT: approximately 2 days. A jury trial has not been demanded. (Daniel, J)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER in Durham: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/18/2020 via Telephone Conference. The Court will adopt #14 Defendant's Individual Rule 26(f) Report; Amended Complaint due within twenty-one (21) days of the Court's order; Answer due within fourteen (14) days of the Amended Complaint; Written Order Forthcoming. (Attended by pro se plaintiff RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS; Attorney Jeffrey Southerland with defendant RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS, II; Proceedings Recorded)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. (Kemp, Donita)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Motions Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER RE: #11 MOTION to Amend #4 Amended Complaint, #12 MOTION to Amend #4 Amended Complaint. (Engle, Anita)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Report (Individual) by RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Daniel, J)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Motions Referred: RE: #14 Rule 26(f) Report (Individual), to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 11/18/2020 09:45 AM via Telephone Conference before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. Re: #14 Rule 26(f) Report (Individual). (Kemp, Donita)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Telephone Notice to pro se plaintiff RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS on 11/12/2020; plaintiff has confirmed that he is in receipt of the Telephone Conference Information scheduled for 11/18/2020 at 9:45 AM. (Kemp, Donita)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED Rule 26(f) Report (Individual). by RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS, II.(SOUTHERLAND, JEFFREY)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Rule 26(f) Report (Individual). by RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS, II.(SOUTHERLAND, JEFFREY) Modified on 11/10/2020. Requested report to be refiled with dates certain. (Garrett, Kim).
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SECOND MOTION to Amend #4 Amended Complaint by RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS. Response due by 11/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Daniel, J)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION by RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS to Amend & Supplement #4 Amended Complaint. Response due by 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Daniel, J)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE filed by RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS of filing of Sheriff's Affidavit of Personal Service on Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Daniel, J)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 11/18/2020 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS, II. (HINTZE, BENJAMIN)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JEFFREY S. SOUTHERLAND on behalf of Defendant RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS, II (SOUTHERLAND, JEFFREY)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS, II. (State Court document originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 20CVS6803, issued 8/26/2020 and filed as Additional Attachment to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS, II, filed by RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS. (State Court document originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 20CVS6803, and filed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS, II, filed by RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS. (State Court document originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 20CVS6803, and filed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1 Petition for Removal (Summons). (Sheets, Jamie)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2904629), filed by RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(HINTZE, BENJAMIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS, II
Represented By: BENJAMIN P. HINTZE
Represented By: JEFFREY S. SOUTHERLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD CALVIN WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?