RAZOR v. SCOTLAND CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION et al
Plaintiff: PERNELL RAZOR
Defendant: YOLANDA COVINGTON, SCOTLAND CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION and KATIE POOLE
Case Number: 1:2020cv00956
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 CASE REFERRED for Screening. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 16, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:20-ct-03314. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - the court ORDERS the clerk to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina where venue is proper. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 10/15/2020. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III for complaint review. (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yolanda Covington, Katie Poole, Scotland Correctional Institution filed by Pernell Razor. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 10/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAZOR v. SCOTLAND CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YOLANDA COVINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTLAND CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATIE POOLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PERNELL RAZOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?