STAUFFER v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MEGAN STAUFFER
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. a division of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc., d/b/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC, TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN, THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. and DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. a division of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc. doing business as TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01140
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Filing 23 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual Courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-4) transferring this action to the Northern District of Georgia. (Butler, Carol)
January 19, 2021 Filing 22 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) RE: MDL 2924 transferring this action to the Northern District of Georgia for the reasons stated in the order of January 19, 2021. Received and filed on January 19, 2021. (Butler, Carol)
January 4, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 2/17/2021 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
December 18, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Hicks, Samantha)
December 18, 2020 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
December 17, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC. (Original filed in Philadelphia County Court of Common Pleas, Docket No: 200800830, and is included in the #1 Notice of Removal.) (Hicks, Samantha)
December 17, 2020 Filing 18 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MEGAN STAUFFER. (Original filed in Philadelphia County Court of Common Pleas, Docket No: 200800830, and is included in the #1 Notice of Removal.) (Hicks, Samantha)
December 17, 2020 Filing 17 ECF 30 Day Notice as to Attorney RANDI KASSAN, TOBIAS MILLROOD, BRIAN RUBENSTEIN, FREDERICK M. ERNY. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 1/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney Tobias Millrood, #2 Notice to Attorney Brian Rubenstein, #3 Notice to Attorney Frederick M. Erny) (Sheets, Jamie)
December 17, 2020 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-05717. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 17, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 17, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 12/16/20. (Attachments: #1 STIPULATION) 12/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by RANDI KASSAN on behalf of Megan Stauffer (KASSAN, RANDI) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by FREDERICK M. ERNY on behalf of COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(ERNY, FREDERICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
November 27, 2020 Filing 12 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County. (kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including The Cooper Companies, Inc. by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14714940), filed by DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
November 16, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Megan Stauffer. (fb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STAUFFER v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. a division of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc., d/b/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC.
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPERSURGICAL, INC.
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. a division of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc. doing business as TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGAN STAUFFER
Represented By: TOBIAS MILLROOD
Represented By: RANDI KASSAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?